Original Case: 1:20-cv-00044

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv.pr-01179
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2021
Terminated:Jul 30, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 02, 2021 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
GREG LEWIS
Represented By
Dennis Jones
DENNIS E. JONES & ASSOCIATES, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ABINGDON AUTO AUCTION, INC.
Represented By
Dennis Jones
DENNIS E. JONES & ASSOCIATES, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADESA, INCORPORATED
Represented By
Jacqueline Carol Johnson
JACKIE JOHNSON, P.C.
contact info
Paul James Kennedy
LITTLER MENDELSON PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/02/2021 4:32 AM EDT
Thursday, February 18, 2021
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00044-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: CPoulsen. 21-1179 CP [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:59 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00044-JPJ-PMS. 21-1179 CP [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:02 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED to Jacqueline Carol Johnson re: change of address. 21-1179 CP [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:29 AM]
Related: [-]