Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11186

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:21-ap-01039
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2021
Terminated:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marie Thatcher
P.O. Box 1204
Pagosa Springs, CO 81147
Represented By
Marie Thatcher
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon E. Rodriguez
Represented By
Peter A. Cal
Sherman & Howard L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 04, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/04 3:03 PM
Adversary Case Number 21-1039 JGR Closed. (bel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 25, 2021
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/25 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion For Consolidation
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
23 23 order Consolidation Tue 11/23 10:04 AM
Order Granting Motion For Consolidation Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Consolidate
Friday, November 19, 2021
22 22 motion Consolidate Fri 11/19 10:55 AM
Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 21-01038 with 21-01039 Filed by Paul M. Grant on behalf of Marie Thatcher. (Grant, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Sunday, November 14, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/14 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Friday, November 12, 2021
20 20 order Compliance With Rules Fri 11/12 3:38 PM
Order Regarding Compliance With FED.R.BANKR.P. 7026 (Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)) Related [+]. Rule 26(a) Report due by 1/7/2022 for18 and for19 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Complaint,19 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/10 10:07 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Paul M. Grant on behalf of Marie Thatcher Related [+]. (Grant, Paul)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/27 5:03 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 14 Related [+] by Simon E. Rodriguez against Marie Thatcher. Filed by Peter A. Cal on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Cal, Peter)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - other1 Complaint
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 10/27 5:00 PM
Status Report Filed by Peter A. Cal on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez Related [+]. (Cal, Peter)
Related: [-] 15 Order to File
Thursday, October 07, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/07 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order to File
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
15 15 order File Tue 10/05 11:03 AM
Order to File Status Report. Related [+]. Status Report due by 10/28/2021 for1 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
14 14 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/20 1:01 PM
Order Granting Third Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint Related [+]. The Court does hereby GRANT the Motion and orders that Defendant's deadline to respond to the Trustee's amended Complaint, once filed, shall be fourteen (14) days following the filing date.
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, April 19, 2021
13 13 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/19 1:51 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Paul M. Grant on behalf of Marie Thatcher Related [+]. (Grant, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Sunday, April 11, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/11 10:20 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thursday, April 08, 2021
11 11 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 04/09 11:07 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Marie Thatcher Answer Due 4/19/2021 Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
10 10 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/06 8:45 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Paul M. Grant on behalf of Marie Thatcher Related [+]. (Grant, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
9 9 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Tue 04/06 6:39 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Attorney Grant is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 8: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 8 Motion
Monday, April 05, 2021
8 8 motion Motion Mon 04/05 11:13 AM
Motion For Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Paul M. Grant on behalf of Marie Thatcher Related [+]. (Grant, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, March 26, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/26 10:21 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
6 6 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 03/24 10:07 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Marie Thatcher Answer Due 4/5/2021 Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, March 22, 2021
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 03/22 10:59 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Paul M. Grant on behalf of Marie Thatcher Related [+]. (Grant, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, February 19, 2021
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Fri 02/19 1:11 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Marie Thatcher, February 19, 2021 Filed by Peter A. Cal on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Cal, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 02/19 1:06 PM
Summons Issued on Marie Thatcher Answer Due 03/22/2021. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Cal, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/19 1:04 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01039 JGR] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30327017. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/19 1:00 PM
Adversary case 21-01039 Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Marie Thatcher. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 06/21/2021 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Cal, Peter)
Related: [-]