New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:21-cv-03032
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2021
Case in other court:Superior Court of Essex County, ESX-L-26-00021
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 18, 2021 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
T-MOBILE US, INC.
Represented By
SCOTT M. COOPER
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JOHN GOETTIG
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA LOCURTO
Represented By
STEVEN I ADLER
Mandelbaum Salsburg, P.C.
contact info
ARLA D. CAHILL
Mandelbaum Salsburg P.C.
contact info
MICHAEL A. SAFFER
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
140 140 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/06 4:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: An in-person settlement conference is scheduled for July 30, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. The senior attorney in charge of the case and client(s) with full settlement authority shall appear in person at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 8, Newark, New Jersey. On or before July 23, 2025, the parties shall submit confidential letters of five (5) pages or less to Chambers summarizing the relevant facts, legal disputes, status of the case, and their respective settlement positions. Please send the papers via email to jra_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/6/2025. (akw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
139 139 order Order Thu 05/01 7:43 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Defendant's motion for reconsideration at ECF130 is denied. It does not meet the relevant standards. The Plaintiff's filing at ECF134 suggests that, through ECF130 , the Defendant's counsel engaged in "sanctionable" conduct. The Court disagrees. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 5/1/2025. (ro, )
Related: [-]