Kyle v. Gyro et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01538 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 18, 2021 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dentsu Aegis Network
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gyro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Kyle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/19 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Craig Schmidt on behalf of Dentsu Aegis Network, Gyro..(Schmidt, Michael) |
|
Sunday, July 18, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order of Discontinuance
Mon 07/19 10:39 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that this case has settled. Dkt. No. 24. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action be conditionally discontinued without prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal. Otherwise, within such time Plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the active calendar of this Court in the event that the settlement is not consummated. Upon such application for reinstatement, the parties shall continue to be subject to the Court's jurisdiction, the Court shall promptly reinstate the action to its active docket, and the parties shall be directed to appear before the Court, without the necessity of additional process, on a date within ten (10) days of the application, to schedule remaining pretrial proceedings and/or dispositive motions, as appropriate. This Order shall be deemed a final discontinuance of the action with prejudice in the event that Plaintiff has not requested restoration of the case to the active calendar within such 30-day period. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/18/2021) (rro) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
order
Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 06/15 3:36 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material..., Motions terminated:20 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery - the parties Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer A. Queliz dated June 14, 2021. filed by Gyro, Dentsu Aegis Network. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/15/2021) (rro) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Tue 06/15 3:15 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Angela Kyle dated June 15, 2021 re: Proposed Stipulation and Order, Dkt 18. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Stoll, Andrew) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 06/15 2:37 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Angela Kyle. Related Document Number:18 ..(Stoll, Andrew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/15/2021 (km) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Tue 06/15 3:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew Stoll to RE-FILE Document 21 Proposed Order. Use the event type Other Filings, Other Documents, Letter. (km) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Discovery
Mon 06/14 12:43 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery - the parties Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer A. Queliz dated June 14, 2021. Document filed by Dentsu Aegis Network, Gyro..(Queliz, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - the parties Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - a redlined copy of the Courts template confidentiality agreement and order | ||
Wednesday, June 09, 2021 | ||
order
Order
Wed 06/09 1:04 PM
ORDER. The Court declines to endorse at this time the parties' May 30, 2021 proposed stipulation and order. Dkt. No. 18. The body of the complaint contains references to the prior company in addition to the reference to that company in the caption. The parties are directed to write the Court no later than June 14, 2021 to explain why a change in the caption alone is sufficient to implement the substitution that they request. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv) |
||
Sunday, May 30, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Stipulation and Order
Sun 05/30 1:51 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Stoll, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Wed 05/26 9:34 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/15/2021 at 10:00 AM through video conference.(ah) |
||
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Mon 05/10 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/9/2021.(ah) |
||
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
6
pgs
order
Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 05/03 12:05 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/13/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr) |
|
Sunday, May 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/03 9:21 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceeding before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636 (c). Motions for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed no later than 1/18/2022. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 8/19/2021. Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Expert Discovery due by 12/17/2021. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3-5 days. Status Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/2/2021) (mro) |
|
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 05/03 3:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2021. (Court Reporter present) (wv) |
||
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 04/23 4:36 PM
ORDER. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 27, 2021 at 3 p.m. is adjourned to April 27, 2021 at 4:30 p.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv) |
||
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/22 6:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Dentsu Aegis Network, Gyro..(Queliz, Jennifer) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/22 6:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dentsu Group Inc., Corporate Parent Dentsu International GPS Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Master Trust Bank of Japan, Ltd. for Dentsu Aegis Network. Document filed by Dentsu Aegis Network..(Queliz, Jennifer) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/22 6:05 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dentsu Group Inc., Corporate Parent Dentsu International GPS Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Dentsu US Inc., Other Affiliate Master Trust Bank of Japan, Ltd. for Gyro. Document filed by Gyro..(Queliz, Jennifer) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/22 5:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Queliz on behalf of Dentsu Aegis Network, Gyro..(Queliz, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Case Management Plan
Tue 04/20 4:22 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Sethi, Rita) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 02/23 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/23/2021) (mro) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/22 3:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gyro waiver sent on 2/21/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Sethi, Rita) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/22 3:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dentsu Aegis Network waiver sent on 2/21/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Sethi, Rita) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/22 1:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dentsu Aegis Network. (sj) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/22 12:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gyro. (sj) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 02/22 12:52 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rita Amy Sethi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 02/22 12:54 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 02/22 12:56 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 02/22 12:57 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 02/19 7:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dentsu Aegis Network, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Sethi, Rita) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 02/19 7:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gyro, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Sethi, Rita) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 02/19 7:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sethi, Rita) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/19 7:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Dentsu Aegis Network, Gyro. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24012800)Document filed by Angela Kyle..(Sethi, Rita) |