California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:21-cv-01453
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Sep 30, 2021
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:19-cv-04248
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 17, 2021 1:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Adam J. Denno
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kalyn Matthews Denno
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gary Robert Matthews
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Stephen Lewis Dahm
Cesari Werner And Moriarty
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Dennis F Moriarty
Cesari Werner And Moriarty
contact info
Defendant
David Q. Matthews
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Defendant
MWCP LLC
Represented By
Ambika K. Doran
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sean M Sullivan
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Bruce Edward Johnson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Davis Wright And Tremaine LLP
contact info
Ambika Kumar
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Frederick Benjamin Burnside
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
MLAF LP
Represented By
Ambika K. Doran
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sean M Sullivan
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Bruce Edward Johnson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Davis Wright And Tremaine LLP
contact info
Ambika Kumar
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Frederick Benjamin Burnside
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rosemary Norris Hall
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Gibson
Represented By
David F Standa
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
David F. Standa
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Kathleen Cerniglia Hipps
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jason Galanis
Defendant
Keith Allen Dilling
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Muddy Waters Capital LLC
Represented By
Ambika K. Doran
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sean M Sullivan
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Bruce Edward Johnson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Davis Wright And Tremaine LLP
contact info
Ambika Kumar
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Frederick Benjamin Burnside
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Muddy Waters Research LLC
Represented By
Ambika K. Doran
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sean M Sullivan
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Bruce Edward Johnson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Davis Wright And Tremaine LLP
contact info
Ambika Kumar
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Frederick Benjamin Burnside
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Castalian Partners, LLC
Represented By
David F Standa
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
David F. Standa
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Kathleen Cerniglia Hipps
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Castalian Partners Value Fund LP
Represented By
David F Standa
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
Daniel A Solitro
Lock Lord LLP
contact info
David F. Standa
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Kathleen Cerniglia Hipps
Greenspoon Marder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carson Block
Represented By
Ambika K. Doran
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sean M Sullivan
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Bruce Edward Johnson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Davis Wright And Tremaine LLP
contact info
Ambika Kumar
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Frederick Benjamin Burnside
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
QKM, LLC
Represented By
Brad Estes
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
MaryAnn T. Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Marc Robert Lewis
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Evangeline A Z Burbidge
Lewis And Llewellyn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven A Sugarman
Represented By
Elliot J Coz
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Christopher Paolino
Cozen O Connor
contact info
Jeremy E Deutsch
Anderson Kill PC
contact info
Jeremy E. Deutsch
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Erik Louis Jackson
Cozen O'Connor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cor Capital, LLC
Represented By
Elliot J Coz
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Christopher Paolino
Cozen O Connor
contact info
Jeremy E Deutsch
Anderson Kill PC
contact info
Jeremy E. Deutsch
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Erik Louis Jackson
Cozen O'Connor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cor Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Elliot J Coz
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Bridget Byrnes Hirsch
Anderson Kill PC
contact info
Christopher Paolino
Cozen O Connor
contact info
Jeremy E Deutsch
Anderson Kill PC
contact info
Jeremy E. Deutsch
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Erik Louis Jackson
Cozen O'Connor LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ryan Kealy
Terminated: 12/23/2019
Represented By
Heather B. Middleton
Murphy Mcgonigle, P.C.
contact info
Theodore R. Snyder
Murphy And Mcgonigle, P.C.
contact info
Edward Scott Zusman
Markun Zusman Freniere & Compton LLP
contact info
Elizabeth M. Del Cid
Murphy And Mcgonigle PC
contact info
Kevin K Eng
Markun Zusman Freniere And Compton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nikolai Bjorkedal
Terminated: 12/23/2019
Represented By
Meghan Marie Baker
Downey Brand LLP
contact info
Christopher Kolkey
Downey Brand LLP
contact info
Eric Paul Heichel
Eiseman Levine Lehrhaupt And Kakoyiannis, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 30, 2021
190 190 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 09/30 3:11 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Pursuant to the Court's Order granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss187 , and in light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention Not to Replead Civil RICO Claims188 , IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the action is DISMISSED in its entirety. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs on Plaintiffs' federal RICO claims, which are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
189 189 3 pgs misc Objection Mon 09/27 3:01 PM
OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other)188 filed by Defendants Carson Block, Castalian Partners Value Fund LP, Castalian Partners, LLC, Adam J. Denno, Keith Allen Dilling, Jason Galanis, James Gibson, Rosemary Norris Hall, MLAF LP, MWCP LLC, David Q. Matthews, Gary Robert Matthews, Kalyn Matthews Denno, Muddy Waters Capital LLC, Muddy Waters Research LLC, QKM, LLC. (Standa, David)
Related: [-]