US DOMINION, INC. et al v. MY PILLOW, INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Carl J Nichols |
Referred: | Moxila A Upadhyaya |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00445 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 02, 2023 3:45 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
MICHAEL J. LINDELL
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
MY PILLOW, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
US DOMINION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J. LINDELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MY PILLOW, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
US DOMINION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
SGO CORPORATION LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
SMARTMATIC USA CORP.
1001 Broken Sound Parkway Suite D
Boca Raton, FL 33487 |
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
HAMILTON PLACE STRATEGIES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
MICHAEL J. LINDELL
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 11 2021
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 11, 2021. (lccjn2) |
|
GPO
May 19 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 19, 2022. (lccjn2) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |