Arizona District Court
Judge:Michelle H Burns
Case #: 2:21-cv-00310
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2021
Terminated:Dec 23, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 18, 2021 1:21 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Davie Clothing Proprietary Limited
Represented By
Marvin Christopher Ruth
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Elizabeth Diane Ferrill
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner Llp - Washington
contact info
Counter Defendant
Cozy Comfort Company LLC
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Messner Reeves Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Davie Clothing Proprietary Limited
Represented By
Marvin Christopher Ruth
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Elizabeth Diane Ferrill
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner Llp - Washington
contact info
Plaintiff
Cozy Comfort Company LLC
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Messner Reeves Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bedabox LLC
Terminated: 07/01/2021
Represented By
Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Motosalas Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, December 23, 2021
71 71 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/23 12:41 PM
ORDER. Having Reviewed the Stipulation of Dismissal70 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all claims, counterclaims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 12/23/2021. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
70 70 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/22 5:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cozy Comfort Company LLC.(Crum, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order