California Central District Court
Judge:Philip S Gutierrez
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:21-cv-01615
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2021
Terminated:Oct 06, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Aug 21, 2021 3:30 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Hulu, LLC
Represented By
James M. Dowd
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Halle And Dorr LLP
contact info
Aaron Shawn Thompson
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Joseph Taylor Gooch
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Erin Greenfield Mehta
Hulu LLC
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Jason Francis Choy
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Mary V. Sooter
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
DIVX, LLC
Represented By
Aaron R. Fahrenkrog
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Rajin S. Olson
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Roman M. Silberfeld
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Deanna H. Thompson
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Seidl
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Shui Li
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Bryan J. Mechell
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Emily J Tremblay
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Mary Pheng
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Daniel Lewis Allender
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
David M Stein
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hulu, LLC
Represented By
James M. Dowd
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Halle And Dorr LLP
contact info
Aaron Shawn Thompson
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Joseph Taylor Gooch
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Erin Greenfield Mehta
Hulu LLC
contact info
Keith T. Howell
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Jason Francis Choy
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Mary V. Sooter
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DIVX, LLC
Represented By
Aaron R. Fahrenkrog
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Rajin S. Olson
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Roman M. Silberfeld
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
David M. Stein
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Deanna H. Thompson
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Seidl
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Shui Li
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Bryan J. Mechell
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Emily J Tremblay
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Mary Pheng
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Daniel Lewis Allender
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
David M Stein
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 25, 2022
105 105 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/26 3:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE104 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. 2 The above-captioned cases, Case No. 2:19-cv-1606 PSG (DFM) and Case No. 2:21- 3 cv-1615 PSG (DFM), are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety and with 4 all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses borne by the party incurring same. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
104 104 4 pgs stip Dismiss Case Wed 08/24 5:38 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff DIVX, LLC.(Powers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order