Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald L Graham
Referred: Chris M Mcaliley
Case #: 1:21-cv-20713
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2021
Terminated:Jun 29, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Aug 21, 2021 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Wilkins E. Castillo
Represented By
Alejandro Israel Leiva
Greenspoon Marder
contact info
Peter Ross Siegel
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
El Otro Tiesto Cafe Corp
Represented By
Alejandro Israel Leiva
Greenspoon Marder
contact info
Peter Ross Siegel
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Marlene Quintana
Plaintiff
Carlos E. Mora
Represented By
Zandro E. Palma
Zandro E. Palma, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
29 29 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Wed 08/04 5:31 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE and DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE; granting in Part and Denying in Part28 Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement and Motion to Dismiss Lawsuit. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 8/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
28 28 motion Settlement Mon 07/19 8:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by CARLOS E. MORA. Responses due by 8/2/2021(Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Billing records
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
27 27 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 06/29 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE UPON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER CLOSING CASE. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
25 25 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 06/24 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint by WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP (Siegel, Peter)
Related: [-]
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 06/24 4:23 PM
In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement, (ECF No. 25), the settlement conference scheduled for July 15, 2021 is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/24/2021. (nsy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
24 24 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 06/21 9:25 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Marlene Quintana. Mediation Hearing set for 8/4/2021 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
23 23 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 06/18 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added CARLOS E. MORA, Marlene Quintana as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 08/4/2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
22 22 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 06/02 6:02 PM
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference. ( Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan.) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (nsy)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/02 9:15 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
20 20 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/01 5:12 PM
ORDER of Reference. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 06/01 5:07 PM
ORDER of Reference of Motions. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 06/01 5:05 PM
ORDER of Referral to Mediation. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/01 5:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference And Trial Dates: Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Calendar Call set for 10/6/2021 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2021 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 6/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/27 1:53 PM
ORDER Of Reference For Settlement Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 5/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
14 14 minutes Status Conference Wed 05/26 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham: Status Conference held on 5/26/2021. Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ra)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/26 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandro Israel Leiva on behalf of WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP. Attorney Alejandro Israel Leiva added to party WILKINS E. CASTILLO(pty:dft), Attorney Alejandro Israel Leiva added to party EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP(pty:dft). (Leiva, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/21 4:38 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP (Siegel, Peter)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/21 4:25 PM
Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by CARLOS E. MORA (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 05/21 4:21 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by CARLOS E. MORA (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
9 9 7 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Fri 04/09 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/26/2021 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 4/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/02 4:28 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP. (Siegel, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 03/25 2:34 PM
ORDER granting in part6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document WILKINS E. CASTILLO. Answer due 4/4/2021; EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP. Answer due 4/4/2021. Re:6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint filed by WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP,1 Complaint filed by CARLOS E. MORA. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 3/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 03/24 1:31 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP. Attorney Peter Ross Siegel added to party WILKINS E. CASTILLO(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ross Siegel added to party EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP(pty:dft).(Siegel, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 18, 2021
5 5 misc Statement Thu 03/18 5:55 PM
Statement of: Claim by CARLOS E. MORA re4 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 02/24 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FLSA CASES Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 2/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/23 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP.(ebz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
Monday, February 22, 2021
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 02/23 8:59 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/22 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against WILKINS E. CASTILLO, EL OTRO TIESTO CAFE CORP. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14423044, filed by CARLOS E. MORA.(Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)