Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela Pepper
Case #: 2:21-cv-00237
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 22, 2021 5:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Young Mens Christian Association of Greater Waukesha County Inc
Represented By
Denise OL Greathouse
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Samuel M Mitchell
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine M Rehm
Represented By
Laura A Lindner
Lindner Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
53 53 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 03/26 9:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/26/2025 re52 Parties' Stipulated Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The parties indicate that they have agreed to mediate and are in the process of securing a mediator and mediation date. The court FINDS that the parties have shown good cause and GRANTS their motion. The court ORDERS that the scheduling conference set for March 26, 2025 is REMOVED from the court's calendar. The court further ORDERS that by the end of the day on June 13, 2025, the parties must file a joint report updating the court as to the status of the mediation and their proposed next steps; if necessary the court will reset the scheduling conference. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
52 52 motion Expedite Tue 03/25 1:48 PM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Stipulated Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference by Young Mens Christian Association of Greater Waukesha County Inc. (Greathouse, Denise)
Related: [-]