Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Referred: William I Garfinkel
Case #: 3:21-cv-00221
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2021
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Aug 22, 2021 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
24/7 Bailbonds, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Plotkin
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Bree Burns
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Ryan McGuigan
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Cao
Represented By
Thomas Plotkin
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Bree Burns
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Ryan McGuigan
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Palmetto Surety Corporation
Represented By
Thomas Plotkin
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Bree Burns
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Ryan McGuigan
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
William Sobota
Represented By
Thomas Plotkin
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Bree Burns
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Ryan McGuigan
Rome Mcguigan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna K Curry
Represented By
Stephen James Curley
Law Offices Of Stephen J. Curley, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 120 Motion for Summary Judgment as to 24/7 and Cao's counterclaims; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 125 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to Counts One and Four of the Amended Complaint; denying 126 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/28/2024. (Friedle, H)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
224 224 respoth Withdrawal of Claim Fri 04/04 3:09 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Claim with Prejudice by Anna K Curry. (Malone, Cort)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
223 223 order Order Wed 04/02 10:37 AM
ORDER: This case has been reportedly settled. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening within 30 days of this Order. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so within 30 days of this Order. The dates set forth in this Order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/2/2025. (Friedle, H)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Wed 04/02 11:24 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J