New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:21-cv-01586
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 23, 2021 9:06 AM EST
Defendant
Plant Growers Workshop, Inc.
90 Madison Drive
Zelienople, PA 16063
Plaintiff
Milton Williams
On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 East 18th Street Suite PHR
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
6 6 3 pgs order Order Tue 02/23 4:47 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, no later than the earlier of 100 days from the date of this Order or two weeks after Defendant appears in the case, the parties shall file a joint letter (unless Defendant has not appeared, in which case Plaintiff shall file the letter individually), not to exceed two pages, including the following information in separately numbered paragraphs: Unless Defendant has already answered, the date on which Plaintiff served Defendant with the Complaint and Defendants deadline to answer. (If Plaintiff has not served Defendant within 90 days of filing the Complaint, in accordance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and filed proof of such service on the docket, the case may be dismissed on that basis.) (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/23/2021) (cf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/23 12:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Plant Growers Workshop, Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/23 12:35 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/23 12:37 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/23 12:37 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 02/23 12:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/22 9:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Milton Williams..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/22 9:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/22 9:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Plant Growers Workshop, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/22 9:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Plant Growers Workshop, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24038616)Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]