Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11303

New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Bruce A Harwood
Case #: 1:21-ap-01008
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2021
Terminated:Oct 20, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hooksett Landing
151 Tenney Mountain Rd PO Box 59
Plymouth, NH 03264
Represented By
Hooksett Landing
contact info
Defendant
Amantino Lopes
157 Tamarack Drive
Stoughton, MA 02072
Represented By
Amantino Lopes
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Larrabee
PO Box 3701
Concord, NH 03302
Represented By
Jeffrey Larrabee
contact info
Defendant
NH Highway Hotel Group, LLC
PO Box 3701
Concord, NH 03302
Represented By
NH Highway Hotel Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ford, McDonald, McPartlin & Borden, P.A.
Ford, McDonald, McPartlin & Borden, P.A. 10 Pleasant St., Ste 400
Portsmouth, NH 03801
Represented By
Edmond J. Ford
Ford, Mcdonald, Mcpartlin & Borden, P.A.
contact info

GPO Sep 20 2023
Memorandum Opinion issued by Chief Judge Bruce A. Harwood Signed on 9/20/2023 (RE: related document(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ford, McDonald, McPartlin & Borden, P.A., 35 Answer to Complaint filed by Cross-Claimant Jeffrey Larrabee, Defendant Jeffrey Larrabee, Cross-Claimant NH Highway Hotel Group, LLC, Defendant NH Highway Hotel Group, LLC, Crossclaim, 150 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Cross-Claimant Jeffrey Larrabee, Defendant Jeffrey Larrabee, Cross-Claimant NH Highway Hotel Group, LLC, Defendant NH Highway Hotel Group, LLC) (So ordered by Judge Bruce A. Harwood )(twh)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, October 20, 2023
court|utility Close Adversary Proceeding (AP)|Disposition of Adversary Fri 10/20 12:58 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed 21-01008 BAH, Disposition of Adversary Judgement for Cross-Claimants Jeffrey Larabee and New Hampshire Highway Hotel Group. (twh)
Related: [-]