Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Timothy S Hillman
Case #: 4:21-cv-40023
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2021
Terminated:Jul 23, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 23, 2021 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Schreiber Law, LLC
Represented By
Edward C. Dial, Jr.
The Schreiber Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa Marti
Represented By
Donald A. Yarbrough
Donald A. Yarbrough, Esq.
contact info
Christopher M. Brine
Brine Consumer Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 16, 2021
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/16 9:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vanessa Marti.(Yarbrough, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 23, 2021
9 9 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Fri 07/23 1:15 PM
District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Tue 07/13 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/04 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward C. Dial, Jr on behalf of Schreiber Law, LLC (Dial, Edward)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/04 3:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Schreiber Law, LLC.(Dial, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 04/16 9:44 AM
District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Donald A. Yarbrough. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/15 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Donald A. Yarbrough Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8730477 by Vanessa Marti.(Brine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Thursday, February 25, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/25 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to John Doe, Schreiber Law, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 02/25 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/24 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe, Schreiber Law, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8652059 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Vanessa Marti.(Brine, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet