California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:21-cv-01725
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2021
Terminated:Nov 01, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 23, 2021 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
2SNZ Group, Inc.
Represented By
Ashley Nicole Arnett
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel
Represented By
Ashley Nicole Arnett
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gitaben Patel
Represented By
Ashley Nicole Arnett
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Ashley Nicole Arnett
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwain Lammey
Represented By
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Russell C Handy
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Zachary Manning Best
Potter Handy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, November 04, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 11/04 8:51 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock counsel for Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. Amanda Seabock is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
19 19 stip Dismiss Case Tue 11/01 11:22 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/28 4:01 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. On June 28, 2022, an Order of the Chief Judge approved transfer of this case to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. On April 12, 2021, an Order Staying the Case was filed (Dkt. No. 13). On August 29, 2022 (Dkt. No. 17) Defendant filed a Status Report. The Court orders quarterly status reports filed effective November 4, 2022, pending decision by the Ninth Circuit Court. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Mon 08/29 9:33 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel.(Sarnoff, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, August 05, 2022
16 16 misc Status Report Fri 08/05 10:19 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel. (Sarnoff, Julia)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Appearance Fri 08/05 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Julia N Sarnoff on behalf of Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel (Attorney Julia N Sarnoff added to party 2SNZ Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julia N Sarnoff added to party Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Julia N Sarnoff added to party Gitaben Patel(pty:dft))(Sarnoff, Julia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
14 14 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 06/28 2:06 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-141) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Garnett, Sherilyn Peace, this case is transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01725-SPG-JCx. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 04/12 2:27 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND DEADLINES (DKT. 12) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation to Stay Case12 : Based on a review of the Parties' Stipulation for an Order Staying Further Proceedings and Deadlines (the "Stipulation" (Dkt. 12)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED, and this action is STAYED pending decisions by the Ninth Circuit in Love v. Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., No. 21-15458 Arroyo v. JWMFE Anaheim, LLC, No. 21-55237 and Garcia v. Gateway Hotel L.P., No 21-55227 (collectively, "Appeals"). The Parties shall submit a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, within fourteen (14) days after a decision is rendered in any of these Appeals, with regards to their respective and/or collective views as to next steps in this action. (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
12 12 stip Stay Case Wed 04/07 12:26 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Three Other Cases Addressing The Same Legal Issue That Is Present In This Case, Pending Before The Court Of Appeals For The Ninth Circuit filed by Defendant 2SNZ Group, Inc., Does, Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel.(Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party Does(pty:dft))(Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ashley N. Arnett in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 01, 2021
11 11 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/01 12:53 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, PERMIT FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' POSSIBLE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT.10 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED, and Defendants Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel, and 2SNZ Group, Inc.'s current 4/2/2021 deadline to respond to Plaintiff Dwain Lammey's Complaint is vacated. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint on or before 4/23/2021 (i.e., within 21 days of Defendants' current 4/2/2021 deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint). Defendants shall file any response to the First Amended Complaint within 21 days of its filing. If Defendants file a Motion to Dismiss, the parties shall file their Opposition and Reply within the time set by this Court's Standing Order. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
10 10 stip Vacate Thu 03/25 2:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Permit Filing of First Amended Complaint, and Set Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Possible Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel.(Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ashley N. Arnett in Support of Joint Stipulation to Vacate,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, February 28, 2021
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Sun 02/28 8:15 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by April 23, 2021. (tj)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sun 02/28 8:14 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/26 3:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/26 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
5 5 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 02/25 1:08 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Gitaben Patel, Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel.(Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/24 1:36 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel, identifying 1. Plaintiff Dwain Lammey, 2. Defendant Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, 3. Defendant Gitaben Patel, 4. Defendant 2SNZ Group, Inc., 5. 2014 B&G Patel Family trust dated April 28, 2014, 6. Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC. (Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Wed 02/24 1:31 PM
DECLARATION of Ashley N. Arnett re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel.(Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Exhibit A
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/24 1:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel. (Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/24 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 21LBCV00028 with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 02/24/2021, receipt number ACACDC-30694678), filed by Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc., Gitaben Patel, Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel. (Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party 2SNZ Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party Gitaben Patel(pty:dft))(Arnett, Ashley)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 02/26 3:11 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 2SNZ Group, Inc.,Bhikubhai Jivanji Patel, Gitaben Patel, Does 1-10., filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/20201 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF ASHLEY N. ARNETT3 . (et)
Related: [-]