Virgin Islands District Court
Judge:Robert A Molloy
Referred: Ruth Miller
Case #: 3:21-cv-00018
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2021
Terminated:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 22, 2021 5:18 AM AST
Defendant
ABC, Corp.
Defendant
JANE DOE
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
St. Thomas East End Medical Center Corp
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant
Nachet Wiliams-Prince
Plaintiff
Deisy J. Bautista-Davila
Represented By
Lee J Rohn
Lee J. Rohn & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Angie Brooks
Represented By
Lee J Rohn
Lee J. Rohn & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Janniel Brooks
1108 King Street, Suite 3
Christiansted, VI 00820
Represented By
Lee J Rohn
Lee J. Rohn & Associates
contact info

GPO Jul 24 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Motion for Intervention 67. (AO)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM AST
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
117 117 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/03 11:16 AM
ORDER (RAM) Plaintiff Bautista's Amended Motion to Approve Settlement on Behalf of JB, a Minor, ECF113 , is GRANTED and the Settlement Agreement as to the minor is APPROVED. It is further ORDERED that in light of the instant Order, Bautista's motion at ECF111 , is rendered MOOT. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. (JRK)
Related: [-]
116 116 minutes Status Conference Wed 01/03 10:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Robert A. Molloy: Status Conference held on 1/3/2024. (Court Reporter Persha Warner.) (CAB)
Related: [-]