California Central District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-00866
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 24, 2021 11:45 PM PST
Defendant
Robert Kaufman (1)
Represented By
Richard D Goldman
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/25/2021 12:17 AM PST
Monday, February 22, 2021
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Robert Kaufman, originating in the District of North Dakota. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3148. Signed by agent Tim Hofer, USMS, Deputy. filed by Plaintiff USA. (cio)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Robert Kaufman; defendants Year of Birth: 1986; date of arrest: 2/22/2021 USMS# 17581-059 (cio)
Related: [-]
3 3 Defendant Robert Kaufman arrested on warrant issued by the USDC District of North Dakota at Bismarck.(cio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Out-of-District Petition
4 4 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Robert Kaufman Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Richard D Goldman for Robert Kaufman, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Temporarily detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 2/23/2021 12:30 PM in CR 880 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (cio)
Related: [-]
5 5 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Robert Kaufman. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (cio)
Related: [-]
6 6 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Robert Kaufman. (cio)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Robert Kaufman. Pending hearing, the defendant shall be held in custody by the U. S. Marshal and produced for the hearing. Detention Hearing set for 2/23/2021 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (cio)
Related: [-]
8 8 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Robert Kaufman. (cio)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Robert Kaufman (cio)
Related: [-]