Oregon District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00061
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2021
Terminated:Feb 23, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 24, 2021 11:26 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kristen Michelle Ayala (1)
Terminated: 02/23/2021


Docket last updated: 02/24/2021 11:50 PM PST
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
1 1 Transfer of Jurisdiction In for Supervision of Release as to Kristen Michelle Ayala Copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet received from Eastern District of Virginia(Alexandria) Case No: 1:15CR00147-2 (jkm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Indictment,
Att: 2 Attachment Judgment,
Att: 3 Attachment Docket
2 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm)
Related: [-]