Original Case: 2:16-cv-09307

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-55152
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2021
Terminated:Mar 01, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 03, 2022 12:53 AM PST
Defendant - Appellant
ALEXANDER DALLAL, an individual
Represented By
John Collingwood Seals
The Law Offices of Collin Seals
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CLAIRE DALLAL, an individual
Represented By
John Collingwood Seals
The Law Offices of Collin Seals
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY
Represented By
Edith Sanchez Shea
Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP
contact info
Melissa Michelle Cowan
Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP
contact info
Keiko Jennifer Kojima
Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/03/2022 12:51 AM PST
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Alexander Dallal and Claire Dallal Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/02/2021. Transcript ordered by 03/22/2021. Transcript due 04/19/2021. Appellants Alexander Dallal and Claire Dallal opening brief due 06/01/2021. Appellee Lincoln Benefit Life Company answering brief due 07/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12013909] (JBS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:22 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet