New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:21-cv-01689
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2021
Terminated:Apr 04, 2022
Case in other court:Supreme Court- County of Westchester, 50085-2021
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 24, 2021 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Jane Conti
Represented By
Melissa C. Rodriguez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Hanna Elizabeth Martin
Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Defendant
New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Melissa C. Rodriguez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Hanna Elizabeth Martin
Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Reale
Represented By
Melissa C. Rodriguez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Hanna Elizabeth Martin
Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ciara Salina
Represented By
Ashish Kapoor
Kapoor Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Roger Chugh
Terminated: 06/23/2021
Represented By
Melissa C. Rodriguez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Hanna Elizabeth Martin
Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Lutz
Terminated: 06/23/2021
Represented By
Melissa C. Rodriguez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Hanna Elizabeth Martin
Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
33 33 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/07 11:43 AM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ciara Salina..(Bisbee, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Thu 03/09 10:21 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 33 Answer. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
32 32 1 pgs order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/04 5:30 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), that the above-captioned action shall be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, with no award of counsel fees or costs by the Court to either side. The Clerk shall close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/4/2022) (mml)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/04 4:33 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
30 30 2 pgs order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/01 4:04 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:29 Status Report filed by New York Life Insurance Company, Jane Conti, Jennifer Reale. ENDORSEMENT: Depositions shall be completed by 3/31/22. All fact discovery shall be completed by 4/29/22. The next conference will be 5/13/22 at 4:45 pm. Any party contemplating a motion at that time shall submit a pre-motion letter of no more than 3 pages by 4/29/22, and the opposing party shall respond, by letter of no more than 3 pages, by 5/6/22. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 3/31/2022. Fact Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 04:45 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/1/2022) (mml)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs misc Status Report Tue 02/01 9:59 AM
STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report pursuant to the Court's December 30, 2021 Order Document filed by Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 01/18 6:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2022. Case did not settle. (la)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
28 28 order Memo Endorsement Mon 01/03 11:23 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:27 Status Report filed by New York Life Insurance Company, Jane Conti, Jennifer Reale. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Discovery stay is continued. The parties shall provide a joint status update no later than 2/1/22 and, if necessary, shall include a proposed discovery schedule. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 12/30/2021) (rro)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Status Report Thu 12/30 9:54 AM
STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report pursuant to the Court's November 16, 2021 Order Document filed by Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
25 25 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 12/09 12:55 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for December 20, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Hanna E. Martin dated December 9, 2021. Document filed by Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 12/09 1:03 PM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference Settlement Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison)(Text Only Order) (Davison, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
24 24 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/17 4:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has scheduled a Settlement Conference before the Honorable Paul E. Davison, United States Magistrate Judge, on December 20, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. Please note Judge Davison's COVID-19 Order (docketed separately) setting forth procedures applicable to all civil cases. Counsel should have either: full independent settlement authority; principals present; or principals readily available by telephone. Counsel are encouraged, but not required, to submit a confidential, ex parte letter to the Court, not to exceed 5 pages in length, no later than two (2) business days prior to the conference, outlining any information counsel believes would assist the Court in preparation for the conference. Until further notice, any such ex parte letter must be emailed to: ChambersNYSDDavison@nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall notify all other parties of their intention to submit an ex parte letter no later than one week prior to the conference. PLEASE NOTIFY ALL OTHER PARTIES OF THE ABOVE INFORMATION IMMEDIATELY. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 11/17/2021) Settlement Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (ks)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/17 4:21 PM
ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in from a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 11/17/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
22 22 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 11/16 11:06 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 11/16/2021) (mml)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 11/16 9:03 AM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Conference: The Court will refer to this case to Judge Davison for settlement. Discovery is paused as of today and will resume if no settlement is reached. The parties shall provide a joint status update no later than 12/31/21. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
20 20 motion Conference Mon 11/15 5:41 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Settlement Conference and Stay of Discovery addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Hanna E. Martin dated November 15, 2021. Document filed by Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
19 19 4 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 09/01 12:15 PM
CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 1/26/2022. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/1/2021) (mml)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 09/01 11:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2021. Plaintiff's counsel Ashish Kapoor, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel Melissa Rodriguez, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Ryan Partelow appears telephonically. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules the next status conference for March 8, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by February 22, 2022; opposition due March 1, 2022. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Tabitha Dente) (wc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
15 15 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/23 2:03 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane Conti, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Ciara Salina..(Kapoor, Ashish)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
13 13 1 pgs motion Extension of Time to Amend Tue 06/15 3:26 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Ashish Kapoor, Esq. dated June 15, 2021. Document filed by Ciara Salina..(Kapoor, Ashish)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 06/15 4:28 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: Amended Complaint due by 6/23/21. Defendants deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to July 30, 2021. If Defendants move to dismiss, Plaintiffs opposition will be due August 13, 2021, and Defendants reply will be due August 27, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 06/03 5:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 6/2/2021. Plaintiff's counsel Ashish Kapoor, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel(s) Hanna Martin, Esq. and Melissa Rodriguez, Esq. appear telephonically. Law Clerk Ryan Partelow appears telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint as to Defendant Lutz. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to be submitted by June 16, 2021. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (or Answer) to be submitted by July 16, 2021; Plaintiff's opposition (if Motion filed) due July 30, 2021; Defendants' reply due August 13, 2021. The Court hereby dismisses Defendant Chugh without prejudice on consent of the parties. See transcript. (Court Reporter Pamela Grimaldi) (wc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
12 12 3 pgs misc Letter Tue 05/25 12:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Ashish Kapoor, Esq. dated May 25, 2021 re: Defendants' letter motion. Document filed by Ciara Salina..(Kapoor, Ashish)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Email re dropping claim against Chugh
Friday, April 30, 2021
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hanna Elizabeth Martin on behalf of Roger Chugh, Jane Conti, Eugene Lutz, Jennifer Reale..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs motion Conference Fri 04/30 12:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting Pre-Motion Conference regarding Defendants' anticipated Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Melissa C. Rodriguez dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Roger Chugh, Jane Conti, Eugene Lutz, New York Life Insurance Company, Jennifer Reale..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - 12.10.2019 E-mail
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa C. Rodriguez on behalf of Roger Chugh, Jane Conti, Eugene Lutz, Jennifer Reale..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Conference Fri 04/30 3:03 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Conference : Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/2/21 at 4:30 pm. Plaintiff shall state her position, by letter of no more than 3 pages, by 5/26/21. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/02 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashish Kapoor on behalf of Ciara Salina..(Kapoor, Ashish)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
6 6 ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: New York Life Ins. Co. may have until 4/30/21 to respond to the Complaint. Counsel for New York Life shall promptly convey a copy of this text order to counsel for Plaintiff, who shall promptly file a notice of appearance (or, if not admitted to the Court, promptly arrange to be admitted or for Plaintiff to be represented by admitted counsel). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs motion Extension of Time Mon 03/01 7:27 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Hanna E. Martin dated 3/1/2021. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Waiver of Service
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/01 6:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hanna Elizabeth Martin on behalf of New York Life Insurance Company..(Martin, Hanna)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/01 8:09 PM
ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: New York Life Ins. Co. may have until 4/30/21 to respond to the Complaint. Counsel for New York Life shall promptly convey a copy of this text order to counsel for Plaintiff, who shall promptly file a notice of appearance (or, if not admitted to the Court, promptly arrange to be admitted or for Plaintiff to be represented by admitted counsel). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/26 9:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/26 9:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/26 9:25 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
3 3 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/25 3:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/25 2:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/25 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: 50085-21. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24096498).Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - Summons,
Att: 2 15 pgs Exhibit 2 - Complaint