Schivek v. AUTHENTIC BRANDS GROUP, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01705 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 24, 2021 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Authentic Brands Group, LLC
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle J. Schivek
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order of Discontinuance
Mon 07/12 4:48 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court is in receipt of a report from the mediator informing the Court that the parties have reached agreement on all issues in this case [ECF #15]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by August 11, 2021. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). All other dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/12/2021) (ama) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/12 4:49 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/11/2021. (ama) |
||
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 06/15 12:03 PM
ORDER: granting13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. This request is GRANTED. The IPTC is ADJOURNED to August 5, 2021 at 11:30 AM. Joint letter, proposed CMP due July 29, 2021. Initial Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/15/2021) (ama) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/14 5:03 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Tana Forrester dated 6/14/2021. Document filed by Danielle J. Schivek..(Forrester, Tana) |
|
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Mon 06/14 11:20 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/8/2021 at 10:15 AM through video conference. (sb) |
||
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 05/28 12:43 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The IPTC is ADJOURNED to July 8, 2021 at 10 AM. The joint letter is due one week before the conference. Initial Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/28/2021) (rj) |
|
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 05/27 1:18 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Tana Forrester dated May 27, 2021. Document filed by Danielle J. Schivek..(Forrester, Tana) |
|
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Wed 05/12 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/11/2021.(ah) |
||
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
order
Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 05/10 10:32 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 05/06 12:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference on June 10, 2021 at 10:00 AM. The conference will be held by telephone. To join, dial 888-278-0296 at the scheduled time. When prompted, enter Access Code 5195844. Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/6/2021) (nb) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
14
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/04 4:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group, LLC..(Gydus, Holly) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/03 11:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Authentic Brands Group, LLC waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Document filed by Danielle J. Schivek..(Forrester, Tana) |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/02 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Holly Genevieve Gydus on behalf of Authentic Brands Group, LLC..(Gydus, Holly) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/26 4:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Authentic Brands Group, LLC..(pc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/26 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Troy L. Kessler on behalf of Danielle J. Schivek..(Kessler, Troy) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 02/26 4:19 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tana Marie Forrester. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AUTHENTIC BRANDS GROUP, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 02/26 4:21 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 02/26 4:21 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 02/26 4:22 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 02/25 10:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Forrester, Tana) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 02/25 10:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Authentic Brands Group, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Danielle J. Schivek..(Forrester, Tana) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/25 10:00 PM
COMPLAINT against AUTHENTIC BRANDS GROUP, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24105465)Document filed by Danielle J. Schivek..(Forrester, Tana) |