Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Nanette K Laughrey
Case #: 2:21-cv-04037
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2021
Terminated:Jul 12, 2021
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Boone County, 21BA-CV00268
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 25, 2021 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Plaza Tire Service, Inc.
Represented By
Brian Murphy O'Neal
Mcmahon Berger
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua L Hayes
1608 Citadel Dr.
Columbia, MO 65202


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, July 29, 2021
32 32 misc Mail Returned Thu 07/29 3:29 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua Hayes. Related [+] (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-] 28
31 31 misc Mail Returned Thu 07/29 3:28 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable as to Joshua Hayes. Related [+] (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-] 29
Monday, July 12, 2021
29 29 order Clerk's Judgment Mon 07/12 4:25 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Lock, Tania) Modified on 7/12/2021 to reflect that a copy was mailed to Joshua L Hayes, 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202(Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order of Dismissal Mon 07/12 3:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. On June 29, 2021, Plaintiff was ordered to show cause why he has not kept the Court apprised of an address at which he could receive mail and to provide a current address as well as his email and phone number by July 9, 2021. Doc. 26 . The Court stated that failure to do so would result in the action being dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs deadline has expired with no response. As such, the action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to respond to the show cause order, failure to appear, and failure to provide accurate contact information to the Court. Signed on 7/12/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin) Modified on 7/12/2021 to reflect NEF mailed to Joshua L Hayes 1608 Citadel Dr. Columbia, MO 65202 (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
30 30 misc Mail Returned Mon 07/12 4:57 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua L Hayes. Related [+] (Houston, Kiambu)
Related: [-] 26
Friday, July 02, 2021
27 27 misc Mail Returned Fri 07/02 12:55 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua L. Hayes. Related [+] (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
26 26 order Order Tue 06/29 10:12 AM
ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. On May 13, 2021, Plaintiff was ordered to show cause by June 14, 2021, why he was not participating in the mandatory Mediation and Assessment Program and was told that failure to show cause by that date would result in the case being dismissed. Doc. 20. Plaintiffs deadline has expired with no response. However, the Court finds that mail from the Court to the address provided by Hayes has been returned as undeliverable since May 2021. It is Hayes obligation to provide the Court an address or other means by which it may deliver messages to him. Hayes is ORDERED to show good cause why he has not kept the Court updated as to his address by July 9, 2021. Hayes is ORDERED to provide an address at which he can receive mail as well as his email and phone number by July 9, 2021. Failure to respond to this order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice, which may prevent him from refiling his claim. Signed on 6/29/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin) Modified on 6/29/2021 to reflect a copy of this Order mailed certified (no. # 7012 3460 0001 7395 5865) to Joshua L Hayes 1608 Citadel Dr. Columbia, MO 65202 on today's date. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
25 25 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/21 3:17 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua L. Hayes. Related [+] (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, June 10, 2021
24 24 misc Mail Returned Thu 06/10 4:39 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua L Hayes. Related [+] (Houston, Kiambu)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Document
Friday, June 04, 2021
23 23 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/07 4:54 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua L Hayes. Related [+] (Houston, Kiambu)
Related: [-] 20
Thursday, June 03, 2021
22 22 misc Mail Returned Thu 06/03 3:19 PM
MAIL RETURNED as to Joshua L. Hayes. Document mailed to Joshua Hayes at 1608 Citadel Dr, Columbia, MO 65202. Related [+] (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, May 28, 2021
21 21 misc Mail Returned Fri 05/28 12:49 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable to Joshua L. Hayes. Related [+] (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, May 13, 2021
20 20 order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/13 4:35 PM
ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The Court has been informed that Plaintiff has failed to follow this Court's Order of February 26, 2021, Doc.5 , regarding participation in the Mediation and Assessment Program. Plaintiff shall show good cause by June 14, 2021, why he has not participated in the mandatory Mediation and Assessment Program. Failure to show good cause by that date will result in the action being dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 5/13/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin) Mailed to Joshua L Hayes, 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 on 5/13/2021 (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 05/05 10:51 AM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint on behalf of Plaza Tire Service, Inc..(O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
18 18 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Tue 04/27 3:35 PM
ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Doc.7 , is denied as moot in light of the filing of the Amended Complaint, Doc.17 . Signed on 4/27/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin) Modified on 4/27/2021 to reflect the NEF mailed to Joshua L Hayes, 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/21 10:51 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaza Tire Service, Inc. Joshua L Hayes. NEF hand delivered to Plaintiff.(Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
16 16 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 04/14 10:03 AM
Teleconference held before the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey on April 14, 2021. Oral argument presented regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff moved for leave to file an Amended Complaint. The Court granted the motion. The Plaintiff is ordered to file any Amended Complaint by April 28, 2021. Plaintiff appears in person and without counsel. Defendants Counsel: Brian Murphy ONeal. Time in Court: 9:01 am 9:31 am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Katie Wirt, 816-512-5608, katie_wirt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania) Modified on 4/14/2021 to reflect a copy was mailed to Joshua Hayes at 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
15 15 order Order Fri 04/09 4:20 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/14/2021 at 9:00 AM regarding pending motion to dismiss (Doc7 ). The parties shall call conference number 877-336-1274, access code: 2707681 to participate. Signed on 04/09/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania) Modified on 4/9/2021 to reflect a copy of this order has been mailed to Joshua L Hayes at 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Thu 04/08 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaza Tire Service, Inc. filed by Brian Murphy O'Neal on behalf of Defendant Plaza Tire Service, Inc..(O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
13 13 order Rules of trial Thu 03/25 4:22 PM
RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 03/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/25 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/21/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2022 08:30 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Bench Trial set for 3/28/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2021. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 3/14/2022. Signed on 03/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) Modified on 3/25/2021 to reflect that a copy was mailed to plainitff (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo on PTC
Friday, March 19, 2021
11 11 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 03/19 2:29 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Plaza Tire Service, Inc.. (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
10 10 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/15 9:20 AM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re7 MOTION to dismiss case Or, In The Alternative, Motion For More Definite Statement on behalf of Plaintiff Joshua L Hayes. Reply suggestions due by 3/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF provided to Joshua Hayes at JC counter Related [+] (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 05, 2021
9 9 order Notice of Pretrial Procedure Fri 03/05 9:45 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 03/05/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Copy mailed to Joshua L. Hayes at 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/03 1:02 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) Modified on 3/3/2021 to reflect a copy of the NEF has been mailed to Joshua L Hayes 1608 Citadel Dr. Columbia, MO 65202 (Ellis, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
8 8 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Tue 03/02 2:37 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re7 MOTION to dismiss case Or, In The Alternative, Motion For More Definite Statement filed by Brian Murphy O'Neal on behalf of Defendant Plaza Tire Service, Inc.. Related [+] (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Dismiss Case Tue 03/02 2:37 PM
MOTION to dismiss case Or, In The Alternative, Motion For More Definite Statement filed by Brian Murphy O'Neal on behalf of Plaza Tire Service, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
6 6 order Rule 16 Notice Fri 02/26 5:13 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/19/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/12/2021. Signed on 02/26/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Copy mailed to Joshua L. Hayes at 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of MAPN Fri 02/26 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Berner, Crystal) Modified on 2/26/2021 to reflect copies mailed to Joshua L. Hayes at 1608 Citadel Dr., Columbia, MO 65202 (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/26 2:58 PM
NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Filing Removal by Plaza Tire Service, Inc. (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Fri 02/26 2:47 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Murphy O'Neal on behalf of Defendant Plaza Tire Service, Inc..(O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/26 2:45 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Brian Murphy O'Neal on behalf of Plaza Tire Service, Inc. (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/26 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County Thirteenth Judicial Circuit County, case number 21BA-CV00268, filed by Brian Murphy O'Neal on behalf of Plaza Tire Service, Inc.. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7305753.(O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet