Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-30056
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2021
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 09, 2021 6:17 PM EST
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Hank Moon
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Samiat Akinyemi (1)
Terminated: 01/29/2021
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Rafael C. Villarruel
Federal Defender Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/09/2021 6:16 PM EST
Friday, January 29, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Samiat Akinyemi held on 1/29/2021. Disposition: Defendant released on bond. Bond Information: 10,000 unsecured. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Rafael Villarruel) (AUSA: Hank Moon) (AFla)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris: Removal Hearing as to Samiat Akinyemi not held on 1/29/2021 Disposition: Waived on the record. Defense counsel to submit written waiver. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Rafael Villarruel) (AUSA: Hank Moon) (AFla)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs PETITION for Transfer under Rule 5(c)(3) by United States of America as to Samiat Akinyemi (1). (AFla)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Public Audio File of Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Samiat Akinyemi held on 1/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. AUDIO FILE SIZE (3.4 MB) (SOso)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Samiat Akinyemi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (SOso)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Samiat Akinyemi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (SOso)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs BOND as to Samiat Akinyemi in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SOso)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs ORDER TRANSFERRING DEFENDANT to Answer Charges Pending in the Western District of Pennsylvania as to Samiat Akinyemi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (SOso)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5 and 5.1 Hearings by Samiat Akinyemi (SOso)
Related: [-]