Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00005
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: Thursday May 05, 2022 8:52 AM EDT
Defendant
William H. Normandin (1)
Represented By
Joanne M. Daley
Ri Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Milind M Shah
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
John P McAdams
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/19/2022 10:59 AM EDT
Thursday, October 29, 2020
Arrest of William Normandin (Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to William Normandin. VIDEO Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2020 at 03:00 PM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Video Information sent to parties. Public Access Information can be found on the Court's website. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond:VIDEO Initial Appearance as to William Normandin held on 10/29/2020, VIDEO Bond Hearing as to William Normandin held on 10/29/2020 (McAdams, Daley) PTS M. Picozzi; All parties present by video; Deft present by video; Deft Counsel addresses the Court; No objection to video hearing; Court informs Deft of rights & charges; Deft understands rights & charges; Judge issues Rule 5(f) oral Brady disclosure order to counsel in accordance with Due Process Protections Act; FPD appointed; Waiver of Preliminary Exam; Court informs Deft of rights; Deft understands rights & waiver; Deft waives hearing; Court accepts waiver as knowing and voluntary; Govt addresses the Court; Court addresses Govt; Deft released on $10,000.00 unsecured bond and conditions; Court informs Deft of penalties; Deft understands penalties and conditions; Deft released(Court Reporter Zoom Recording in Courtroom Video at 3:11 pm.)(Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to William Normandin (1).(Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to William Normandin. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/29/2020. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by William Normandin accepted by MJ Almond (Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5 as to William Normandin. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/29/2020.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
7 7 Appearance Bond Entered as to William Normandin in amount of $10,000.00 UNSECURED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/29/2020.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to William Normandin (1) $10,000.00 UNSECURED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/29/2020.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/29/2020 Newport, RI in case as to William Normandin. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
10 10 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to William Normandin. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (McAdams, John) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
11 11 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to William Normandin (1). The period from 11/1/2020 through 1/31/2021 is excluded. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/23/2020.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:20-mj-00103-LDA]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS by USA as to William H. Normandin re13 Indictment (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to William H. Normandin. VIDEO Arraignment set for 2/4/2021 at 02:00 PM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 857 2431, Passcode: 611961) (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to William H. Normandin (1) count(s) 1-2, 3.(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet