Ploen v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00594 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 27, 2021 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ploen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Zgoda, Richard) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 03/01 2:04 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Ploen v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-594-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Montana (sshe, ) |
|
Sunday, February 28, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9676965.), filed by Robert Ploen. Service due by 6/1/2021(sshe, ) |