Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 9:21-cv-80439
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2611 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2021
Terminated:May 03, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Aug 28, 2021 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Aspen Square Management, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer A. Schwartz
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Leslie Lagomasino Baum
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC.
Represented By
Leslie Lagomasino Baum
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Leslie Lagomasino Baum
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
SABAD ROJAS-MORALES
Represented By
Yadhira Ramirez-Toro
Trembly Law Firm
contact info
Ruben Martin Saenz
Saenz & Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Aron Smukler
Saenz , Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Tanesha LaShay Marie Walls
Saenz & Anderson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 01, 2022
41 41 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 09/01 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
40 40 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 08/25 8:34 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGING [ECF No. 36] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, discharging36 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
39 39 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 08/22 5:18 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES.(Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
38 38 misc Status Report Mon 08/22 5:04 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AS TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 08/18 6:19 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 08/15 11:10 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the Parties Failed to File a Joint Status Report by the Original Deadline of June 27, 2022. Show Cause Response due by 8/22/2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 06/24 2:27 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Leslie Lagomasino Baum representing Aspen Square Management, Inc. (Defendant) and JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC. (Defendant) and NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 6/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
34 34 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/23 1:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Leslie Lagomasino Baum for / by Aspen Square Management, Inc., JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC., NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2022(Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
33 33 misc Status Report Tue 04/26 5:14 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AS TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 02/25 2:04 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AS TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 31, 2021
31 31 misc Status Report Fri 12/31 1:15 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AS TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 11/01 3:47 PM
STATUS REPORT as to Dispute Resolution Process (filed jointly) by Aspen Square Management, Inc., JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC., NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC (Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
29 29 misc Status Report Tue 08/31 5:02 PM
STATUS REPORT as to Dispute Resolution Process (filed jointly) by Aspen Square Management, Inc., JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC., NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC (Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 07/02 11:06 AM
STATUS REPORT as to Dispute Resolution Process pursuant to this Court's May 3, 2021 Order [ECF No. 27] (Filed Jointly) by Aspen Square Management, Inc. (Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Compel Mon 05/03 12:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S22 MOTION TO STAY CASE AND COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH HIS AGREEMENT TO ARBITRATE HIS CLAIMS. Denying as Moot11 Motion to Stay; Denying as Moot11 Motion to Compel; Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/30 10:44 AM
NOTICE by Aspen Square Management, Inc., JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC., NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC of Filing Proposed Agreed Order, filed jointly (Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
25 25 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/21 10:38 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES. NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/21 10:38 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES. JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/20 6:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Case MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES. Replies due by 4/27/2021. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stay Tue 04/20 2:35 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Plaintiff to Comply with His Agreement to Arbitrate His Claim by Aspen Square Management, Inc., JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC., NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC. Attorney Leslie Lagomasino Baum added to party JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC. (pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Lagomasino Baum added to party NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/4/2021(Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Wendy Touchette in Support of Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
21 21 service Summons Issued Tue 04/13 1:47 PM
Summons Issued as to NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC. (cds)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Tue 04/13 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Defendant NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES LLC by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Smukler, Aron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/13 9:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. On or before May 3, the parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties as ordered by the Court in5 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/13/2021. (jrt)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/13 10:23 AM
Reset Deadlines Per DE#19. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/3/2021 (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/12 3:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint scheduling report re5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES. Responses due by 4/26/2021(Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order extension of time to file joint scheduling report
Friday, April 09, 2021
17 17 service Summons Issued Fri 04/09 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC., NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC. (cds)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 04/09 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES. Attorney Aron Smukler added to party SABAD ROJAS-MORALES(pty:pla). (Smukler, Aron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Wed 04/07 10:54 AM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): JOHNSON REAL ESTATE INVESTORS, LLC. and NEPSA ADMIN SERVICES, LLC. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 04/07 8:21 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 04/06 9:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SABAD ROJAS-MORALES, filed by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES.(Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/06 3:41 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aspen Square Management, Inc. (Schwartz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stay Compel Tue 04/06 3:39 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Stay Case , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Aspen Square Management, Inc.. Responses due by 4/20/2021(Schwartz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (a)
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/31 10:12 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Wed 03/31 10:10 PM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/31 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer A. Schwartz on behalf of Aspen Square Management, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer A. Schwartz added to party Aspen Square Management, Inc.(pty:dft). (Schwartz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 03/24 12:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Defendant's Partially Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/24/2021. (jrt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 03/23 1:08 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint (Partially Unopposed) by Aspen Square Management, Inc.. Attorney Leslie Lagomasino Baum added to party Aspen Square Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 03/10 2:39 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by April 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (tgs) Modified text on 3/10/2021 (mno)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 03/08 3:35 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES. Aspen Square Management, Inc. served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/02 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Aspen Square Management, Inc.. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 03/02 8:55 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/01 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14470319, filed by SABAD ROJAS-MORALES.(Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)