Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Hildy Bowbeer
Case #: 0:21-cv-00611
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2021
Terminated:Mar 26, 2021
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:20-cv-05138
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
WuXi AppTec, Inc.
2540 Executive Drive
St. Paul, MN 55120
Represented By
Jeremy D Sosna
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Moore

GPO Dec 15 2020
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
GPO Dec 15 2020
ORDER THAT MOTION OF DEFT WUXI APPTEC, INC. TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS GRANTED; & THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION OF DEFT WUXI APPTEC, INC. TO DISMISS THIS ACTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 29, 2021
15 15 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 03/29 12:04 PM
JUDGMENT(MMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Friday, March 26, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/26 1:45 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/26/2021.(las)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
13 13 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 03/25 11:41 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 Stipulation of Dismissal. (kt)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/25 11:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal. Jointly signed by Alan Moore and WuXi AppTec, Inc. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Wed 03/03 11:05 AM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. The Court directs Defendant to file its answer by Friday, March 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/3/2021. (ERE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
10 10 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Tue 03/02 7:31 AM
(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Peter R. Bryant, Gavin P. Lentz, Rachel Fendell Satinsky as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (kt) cc: Peter R. Bryant, Gavin P. Lentz, Rachel Fendell Satinsky. (kt)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 03/02 7:25 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per 3rd/4th Master List.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
8 8 ORDER THAT MOTION OF DEFT WUXI APPTEC, INC. TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS GRANTED; & THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION OF DEFT WUXI APPTEC, INC. TO DISMISS THIS ACTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 27, 2020
6 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re4 First MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue filed by WUXI APPTEC, INC.. (SATINSKY, RACHEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
5 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re4 First MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue filed by ALAN MOORE.(LENTZ, GAVIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 05, 2020
4 4 First MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue filed by WUXI APPTEC, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SATINSKY, RACHEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALAN MOORE. WUXI APPTEC, INC. waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (LENTZ, GAVIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
Summons Issued as to WUXI APPTEC, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/16/2020 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER R. BRYANT on behalf of ALAN MOORE. (BRYANT, PETER) Modified on 10/16/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against WUXI APPTEC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14641080.), filed by ALAN MOORE.(LENTZ, GAVIN) Modified on 10/16/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 3 Designation Form