New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:21-cv-01795
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2021
Terminated:Dec 16, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD.
Represented By
Armen Richard Vartian
Armen R. Vartian, Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristian Sanchez
Represented By
Joseph H Mizrahi
Cohen & Mizrahi LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, December 16, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 12/16 11:17 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences and deadlines are CANCELLED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/16/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stay Lifted Thu 12/16 11:17 AM
Case Stay Lifted. (va)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
18 18 misc Status Report Wed 12/15 11:56 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
17 17 order Memo Endorsement Thu 12/09 11:19 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:16 Status Report filed by Cristian Sanchez. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/9/2021) (ate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 12/08 6:31 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Case Stayed Mon 11/08 6:49 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties are in the process of finalizing a confidential settlement agreement in this case. The parties have requested that the Court stay this case and adjourn all deadlines and conferences. The parties' request is granted in part and denied in part. The Court will not grant an indefinite stay. The parties are directed to file either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order. If a stipulation of settlement is not filed within 30 days, the parties will be required to show good cause why a further stay should be allowed and why it would not be sufficient and the proper exercise of judicial authority to require the parties either to continue to litigate or, if they wish to settle with a confidential settlement document, to remit them to their rights under that settlement document if the terms are not satisfied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to stay this case for thirty (30) days and to adjourn all pending deadlines and conferences by thirty (30) days. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/8/2021) (ate)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 11/08 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
13 13 misc Letter Thu 06/03 11:41 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Joseph Mizrahi dated 6/3/21 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
12 12 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 05/11 5:06 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD...(Vartian, Armen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 05/10 10:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/6/2021 by Telephone Conference. Joseph Mizrahi present by telephone for Plaintiff. Armen Vartian present by telephone for Defendant. Case management plan with respect to initial disclosures is approved. The rest of discovery is stayed pending decision on the motion to dismiss. Status Conference to determine schedule will be considered after decision on motion to dismiss, if necessary. (mf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
11 11 21 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/04 7:39 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
10 10 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 05/03 10:18 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
9 9 10 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 04/20 5:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD...(Vartian, Armen)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 04/20 5:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Document filed by Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD.. Responses due by 5/4/2021.(Vartian, Armen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/02 4:27 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Armen R. Vartian dated April 2, 2021. Document filed by Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD...(Vartian, Armen)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/02 5:42 PM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Armen R. Vartian dated April 2, 2021.. All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 03/30 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on May 6, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/30/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/03 10:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/03 10:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/03 10:33 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/03 10:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/02 1:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/02 1:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/02 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Universal Coin & Bullion, LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24153506)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]