Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10155

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 1:21-ap-01001
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2021
Terminated:May 19, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Salomon Campos, Jr.
2101 Grambling Ave
McAllen, TX 78504
Represented By
Salomon Campos, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
US Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/19 10:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1001 Closed. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/06 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Judgment
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
22 22 order Judgment Tue 05/04 10:47 AM
Stipulated Judgment and Order of Dismissal. in 1:21-ap-1001 Signed on 5/4/2021 (jchavez)
Related: [-]
21 21 court Courtroom Minutes Tue 05/04 10:21 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:00 a.m.. Appearances: Ha Nguyen for United States Trustee, Plaintiff; Hector Picazo for the Defendant; Ernesto Gamez, State Court Counsel for Defendant. Minutes: Opening statements by Mr. Picazo. After no objection, Defendant's Exhibits A-D were admitted. After no objection, Debtor's Affidavit was admitted into the record. Motion for entry of stipulated judgment granted. Court to sign proposed Order. Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing,9 Generic Motion
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/29 6:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Special Notice
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
19 19 misc Exhibit List Tue 04/27 10:18 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Salomon Campos, Jr. ) Related [+] (Oliva, Marcos)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
Monday, April 26, 2021
18 18 misc Affidavit Mon 04/26 9:34 AM
Affidavit Re: In Support of Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgment and Order of Dismissal (Filed By Salomon Campos, Jr. ) Related [+] (Oliva, Marcos)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
17 17 notice Multi-case Notice Mon 04/26 9:33 AM
Notice of Technological Upgrade (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
16 16 court Courtroom Minutes Thu 04/15 11:35 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00 a.m.. Appearances: Ha Nguyen for the Plaintiff; Hector Picazo for the Defendant; Salomon Campos present by phone only; Ernesto Gamez, State Court Counsel for Defendant in criminal case. Minutes: Arguments heard. Matters continued to 5/4/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Mr. Picazo to file witness and exhibit list no later than 4/29/2021. Related [+]. Hearings re-scheduled for 5/4/2021 at 10:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing,9 Motion
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
15 15 misc Exhibit List Tue 04/13 11:22 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Salomon Campos, Jr. ) Related [+] (Oliva, Marcos)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
14 14 misc Exhibit List Tue 04/13 10:29 AM
Exhibit List (Filed By US Trustee ) Related [+] (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Saturday, April 10, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/10 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, April 08, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Thu 04/08 2:54 PM
Notice of Order and Certificate of Service . Related [+] Filed by US Trustee (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Hearing
11 11 order Setting Hearing Thu 04/08 1:30 PM
Order Setting Electronic Hearing Signed on 4/8/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2021 at 11:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgment and Order of Dismissal
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate Wed 04/07 9:19 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By US Trustee ) Related [+] (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
9 9 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 04/07 9:09 AM
Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgment and Order of Dismissal Filed by US Trustee (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 02, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, April 01, 2021
7 7 notice Notice Thu 04/01 4:59 PM
Notice of Order and Certificate of Service . Related [+] Filed by US Trustee (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
6 6 order Setting Hearing Wed 03/31 2:31 PM
Order for Electronic Scheduling Conference. Signed on 3/31/2021 Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/15/2021 at 11:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, March 22, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/22 3:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Salomon Campos, Jr. (Oliva, Marcos)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 04, 2021
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/04 8:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on Salomon Campos, Jr. 3/4/2021. (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 03/04 9:00 AM
Receipt of Complaint 21-01001 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number o. Fee amount $ 350.00. (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 03/03 9:18 AM
Summons Issued on Salomon Campos, Jr. Date Issued 3/3/2021. (RuthGuerrero)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 03/02 11:46 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Salomon Campos, Jr.. (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 03/02 11:38 AM
Adversary case 21-01001 Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) Complaint Objecting to Discharge by US Trustee against Salomon Campos, Jr.. Fee Amount $350 (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet