Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Jane M Virden
Case #: 3:21-cv-00044
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2021
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By
William F. Ray
Watkins & Eager
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry King
Represented By
Toby Justin Gammill
Gammill Law Group, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America, Via Cigna
Terminated: 04/08/2021
Represented By
William F. Ray
Watkins & Eager
contact info
Defendant
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Terminated: 05/26/2021
Represented By
William F. Ray
Watkins & Eager
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/14 10:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice re11 Stipulation of Dismissal. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 7/14/21. (ab)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/09 9:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice . (Ray, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/25 5:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, Via Cigna,, filed by Terry King. (Gammill, Toby)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/25 11:29 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Motion for extension of time to answer. Defendant's answer is due on or before June 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/25/21. (ncb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/25 11:32 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company answer due 6/23/2021. (ncb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Other) Mon 05/24 2:22 PM
Consent MOTION to Allow Second Amended Complaint and Extend Deadline to Answer by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Life Insurance Company of North America, Via Cigna. (Ray, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/07 4:11 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/7/21. (ncb)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/07 10:48 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Life Insurance Company of North America, Via Cigna. (Ray, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/28 11:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toby Justin Gammill on behalf of Terry King Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company served on 4/22/2021. (Gammill, Toby)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/20 3:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
notice Notice of Correction Thu 04/08 11:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re3 Amended Complaint; Doc [#]: Request for Issuance of Summons should be emailed to the Clerks e-mail address at: ecf_information@msnd.uscourts.gov. (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/06 12:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Jury Demand, filed by Terry King. (Gammill, Toby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/02 12:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, Via Cigna. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/02 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1914438, filed by Terry King. (tab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Tue 03/02 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
Related: [-]