Williams v. S & S Management Group, LLC
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel P Jordan, III |
Referred: | F Keith Ball |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00149 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, 20-00695 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 28, 2021 4:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
S & S Management Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonya Williams
30 Robbins Street
Rienzi, MS 38865 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() JUDGMENT. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 5/27/2021 (VM) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 5/27/2021 (VM) |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
order
Order
Mon 05/24 1:48 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling the telephonic case management conference set for May 27, 2021. No further written order shall issue from the Court. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at 30 Robbins Street, Rienzi, MS 38865.) Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/24/2021. (JEJ) |
||
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: As set out in the Order, Plaintiff is directed to show cause why this action should not be dismissed. She is instructed to file a response to Defendants motion5 by May 19, 2021. Failure to respond, combined with the failure to comply with the Court's prior Order4 , may result in dismissal of this action with prejudice to refiling and without further notice. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on May 6, 2021.(SP) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/22 10:04 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Blythe K. Lollar terminated. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/22/2021. (dcw) |
||
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by S & S Management Group, LLC (Kidd, Dean) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Benito Hernandez on behalf of S & S Management Group, LLC (Hernandez, Juan) |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Defendant shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at 30 Robbins Street, Rienzi, MS 38865.) (JEJ) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tonya Williams Plaintiff's Counsel Withdrawal (Norris, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by S & S Management Group, LLC (Kidd, Dean) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by S & S Management Group, LLC (Kidd, Dean) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER re3 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff shall notify the Court, in writing, on or before 4/30/2021, of her election to either employ private counsel or to proceed pro se, and, if she elects the latter, she shall provide her address and telephone number to the Court. Plaintiff's failure to meet these requirements may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/11/2021. (dcw) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tonya Williams (Norris, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/05 11:57 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. S & S Management Group, LLC answer due 3/12/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHAL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/5/2021. (dcw) |
||
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal,,, by S & S Management Group, LLC (Lollar, Blythe) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by S & S Management Group, LLC from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 20-695. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0538-4493874) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (VM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |