Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:21-cv-00448
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2021
Terminated:Mar 04, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 4:03 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
MidAmerican Energy Services LLC
Represented By
Danielle Katharina Hatchitt
Weisbart Springer Hayes LLP
contact info
Scott Ryan Riddle
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info
Julie Ann Springer
Weisbart Springer Hayes LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Beth Miletello
Represented By
Brandi J McKay
Brown Fox PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Strain
Brown Fox PLLC
contact info
Defendant
MidAmerican Energy Services LLC
Represented By
Danielle Katharina Hatchitt
Weisbart Springer Hayes LLP
contact info
Scott Ryan Riddle
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info
Julie Ann Springer
Weisbart Springer Hayes LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Robert C Jenevein
Waddell Serafino Geary Rechner Jenevein, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Beth Miletello
Represented By
Brandi J McKay
Brown Fox PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Strain
Brown Fox PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 04, 2022
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Fri 03/04 3:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE: The Court DISMISSES all Plaintiff's claims, in their entirety, WITH PREJUDICE to the refiling of same in any form. All taxable costs and attorneys' fees are to be paid by the party incurring same. This isa FINAL JUDGMENT in this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/4/2022) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
29 29 motion Dismiss Wed 12/29 9:45 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Beth Miletello (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 16, 2021
28 28 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 12/16 12:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part27 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The Court hereby AMENDS its Scheduling Order10 by extending all remaining deadlines in this action. Accordingly, the Court SETS the following deadlines: (1) Deadline for Completion of Discovery: February 4, 2022. (2) Deadline for Dispositive Motions: March 4, 2022. (3) Deadline for Expert Objections: April 4, 2022. (4) Deadline for Pretrial Disclosures and Objections: April 18, 2022. (5) Deadline for Pretrial Materials (pretrial order etc.): May 19, 2022. (6) Settlement Conference: 10 days prior to Pretrial Conference. (7) Exchange of Exhibits: 2 days prior to Pretrial Conference. (8) Pretrial Conference: Friday, June 3, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. (9) Trial: Monday, June 6, 2022. All other provisions of the Original Scheduling Order10 remain applicable to this Amended Scheduling Order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/16/2021) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Optional) Thu 12/16 2:00 PM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings terminated and reset per 28 Electronic Order. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Motions due by 3/4/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 5/19/2022. Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Trial set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (mjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Wed 12/15 10:28 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC (Springer, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order First Amended Scheduling Order
Thursday, October 14, 2021
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 10/14 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Brandi J McKay on behalf of Beth Miletello. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/16 10:24 AM
NOTICE of MidAmerican Energy Services, LLC's Expert Disclosures filed by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC (Hatchitt, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/24 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Initial Expert Designations filed by Beth Miletello. (mla)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 08/24 11:31 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Expert Designation Late, referencing22 Plaintiff's Initial Expert Designation. (Clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/24/2021) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
22 22 misc Supplemental Document Mon 08/23 4:29 PM
Supplemental Document by Beth Miletello as to21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Expert Designation Late . (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Leave to File Mon 08/23 12:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Expert Designation Late filed by Beth Miletello (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
20 20 order Protective Order Wed 08/04 2:37 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/4/2021) (svc)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 08/04 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting18 Joint Motion to Enter Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/4/2021) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
18 18 motion Protective Order Tue 08/03 5:33 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Beth Miletello (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 07/15 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Katharina Hatchitt for Scott R. Riddle on behalf of MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. (Hatchitt, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order For ADR Wed 07/14 10:32 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Robert C Jenevein, as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/19/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/14/2021) (svc)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/14 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying13 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Defendant must designate local counsel within 14 days of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/14/2021) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 07/13 4:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATOR filed by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. (Hatchitt, Danielle)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/13 4:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear and represent Defendant MidAmerican Energy without local counsel filed by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC (Hatchitt, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order For Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 06/16 12:31 PM
DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. (Hatchitt, Danielle) Modified on 6/16/2021 (svc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/16 10:14 AM
NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Beth Miletello (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/08 4:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial beginning 4/18/2022 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/22/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2021. Motions due by 1/18/2022. Discovery due by 12/20/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/19/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 4/4/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/8/2021) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 06/07 4:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Beth Miletello. (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
8 8 order Status Report Order Mon 05/17 3:08 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 6/7/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/17/2021) (svc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 05/14 1:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. (Hatchitt, Danielle)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 05/14 9:50 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Beth Miletello filed by MidAmerican Energy Services LLCAttorney Danielle Katharina Hatchitt added to party MidAmerican Energy Services LLC(pty:dft) (Hatchitt, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/15 12:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. Waiver sent on 3/15/2021. (Springer, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/03 8:45 AM
Summons Issued as to MidAmerican Energy Services LLC. (mjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
3 3 qcref Boyle Wed 03/03 8:40 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 03/02 5:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beth Miletello. (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/02 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against MidAmerican Energy Services, LLC filed by Beth Miletello. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11655427) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McKay, Brandi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Employment Confientiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - September Ltr,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - October Ltr,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D - Miletello Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E - Ltr to MidAmerican,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F - MidAmerican Response,
Att: 7 Cover Sheet