Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 3:21-cv-00033
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2021
Terminated:Jun 15, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 5:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Viking Credit Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Cheryl Estrada
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Berry
Berry & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Matthew J Landreau
Berry & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 07/27 8:59 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/26 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Viking Client Services, LLC filed by Cheryl Estrada (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/15 3:27 PM
ORDER directing Clerk to administratively close the case. The parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/15/2021. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/15 3:28 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated from case. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 06/11 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Viking Credit Services, LLC by Cheryl Estrada (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/10 10:59 AM
ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 03/09 8:40 AM
Clerks Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 03/04 2:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Cheryl Estrada. (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
2 2 5 pgs order Order Tue 03/02 3:36 PM
TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/2021. (dmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/02 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10782307) filed by Cheryl Estrada.(dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet