Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 4:21-cv-10408
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 03, 2021 10:14 PM EST
Defendant
Mary Zamora
Defendant
Connie Whipple
Defendant
Heidi Washington
Defendant
Robert Vashaw
Defendant
Natalie C. Sowder
Defendant
Smith
Defendant
Richard D. Russell
Defendant
Keith Papendick
Defendant
Patricia Lamb
Defendant
Richard Dodman
Defendant
Candace Comer
Defendant
Loria Coleman
Defendant
Karen Branch
Defendant
Kelly Bennett
Defendant
Darrel Barrows
Defendant
Stephanie Adams
Plaintiff
Lilbert Gregory
212885 G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 3500 N. ELM ROAD
JACKSON, MI 49201

GPO Mar 09 2021
ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
GPO Jul 27 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant Defendants' 32 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (JOwe)
GPO Sep 01 2022
ORDER (1) Adopting Recommended Disposition of 40 Report and Recommendation and (2) Granting Defendants' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Feb 09 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Zamora. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (LHos)
GPO Mar 04 2024
ORDER (1) Adopting Recommended Disposition of 65 Report and Recommendation and (2) Granting Defendant Zamora's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Jul 02 2024
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)

Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
minutes Status Conference Fri 04/18 10:26 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/18/2025. Parties to work together to prepare and submit stipulated order of dismissal. Dismissal will be entered because Plaintiff is participating as a creditor in Corizon bankruptcy proceedings. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
Related: [-]