New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:14-cv-04021
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2014
Terminated:Dec 01, 2016
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
BOB CIASULLI AUTO GROUP, INC.,
Defendant
RENE CRUZ
Defendant
United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus
Represented By
RESA T. DRASIN
Woehling & Freeman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RAMEE AYESH
Represented By
ERICA LYNN SHNAYDER
Arce Law Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN GUZMAN
Represented By
ERICA LYNN SHNAYDER
Arce Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
49 49 order Stipulation and Order Tue 01/24 1:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to Plaintiff Christian Guzman, w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/23/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
48 48 order Stipulation and Order Tue 01/24 1:19 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to Plaintiff Ramee Ayesh w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/23/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
47 47 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/20 11:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2016
46 46 order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 12/01 11:32 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/30/16. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 12/01 11:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 11/30/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
45 45 order Order Tue 10/25 4:15 PM
TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Settlement Conference from 11/29/2016 to 11/30/2016 at 10:00 am in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/25/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
44 44 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/19 3:44 PM
TEXT ORDER - A Settlement Conference is set for 11/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Clients with full settlement authority should be physically present. The parties shall submit confidential position letters, by email to LDW_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, at least 3 business days in advance.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/19/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 09/20 8:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 9/19/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
43 43 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/30 3:45 PM
TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 9/19/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/30/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 08/30 3:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2016
42 42 order Order Thu 08/04 2:43 PM
TEXT ORDER - At the request of defense counsel, the telephone conference set before Magistrate Judge Leda Dunn Wettre for 8/29/2016 at 3:30 PM is hereby rescheduled for 8/30/2016 at 3:30 PM. Counsel for defendants shall initiate the call to (973) 645-3574 once representatives for all parties are on the line.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/4/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
41 41 misc Letter Wed 08/03 12:47 PM
Letter from Resa T. Drasin, Esq.. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
40 40 order Order Thu 07/28 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER - The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference before Magistrate Judge Leda Dunn Wettre on 8/29/2016 at 3:30 PM. Counsel for defendants shall initiate the call to (973) 645-3574 once representatives for all parties are on the line.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/28/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 07/28 3:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 7/28/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
39 39 misc Letter Tue 07/26 10:42 AM
Letter from Resa T. Drasin, Esq.. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/22 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN SAMUEL ARCE on behalf of RAMEE AYESH, CHRISTIAN GUZMAN (ARCE, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
37 37 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/24 10:59 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/28/2016 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Fact Discovery due by 4/25/2016, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/23/2016. (ek)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 03/23 1:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 3/23/2016. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
36 36 order Order Mon 03/21 3:16 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's35 Letter request for appearance at the settlement conference of March 23, 2016 by telephone, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/21/2016. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2016
35 35 misc Letter Sat 03/19 10:40 AM
Letter from Erica L. Shnayder. (SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
34 34 order Order Tue 03/15 11:56 AM
ORDER denying request to further adjourn the settlement conference. Any further extension of the final discovery deadline will be discussed at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/15/16. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 13, 2016
33 33 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Sun 03/13 5:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Letter Motion by RAMEE AYESH, CHRISTIAN GUZMAN. (SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
32 32 order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 02/16 11:28 AM
ORDER denying30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/11/16. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
31 31 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/25 1:19 PM
ORDER, extending Fact Discovery through 3/15/2016, and adjourning the Settlement Conference to 3/23/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/13/16. (sr, )
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Compel Fri 01/22 1:14 PM
MOTION to Compel by United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus.(DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Resa T. Drasin, Esq.,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/22 1:19 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to30 MOTION to Compel . Motion set for 2/16/2016 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
29 29 order Order Fri 01/15 1:17 PM
ORDER permitting counsel on behalf of United Galaxy, Inc. leave to move to compel compliance with the Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/14/16. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
28 28 misc Letter Wed 01/13 12:06 PM
Letter.(DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena and related correspondence
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
27 27 misc Letter Tue 01/12 1:38 PM
Letter from Resa T. Drasin, Esq.. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
26 26 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/15 11:56 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: scheduling a Settlement Conference for 1/26/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, Fact Discovery shall be completed by by 1/15/2016; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/14/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
minutes Status Conference Thu 10/15 8:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 10/14/2015. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2015
25 25 order Order Thu 10/08 12:58 PM
TEXT ORDER - Defense Counsel's request to adjourn the telephone conference set for 10/8/2015 has been granted. The Telephone Conference is rescheduled to 10/14/2015 at 3:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all representatives are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/8/2015. (kd)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Letter Thu 10/08 11:53 AM
Letter from Resa T. Drasin, Esquire. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
23 23 order Order Fri 10/02 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Telephone Conference Call will go forward as scheduled on 10/8/2015 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/2/2015. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2015
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/29 2:50 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (th, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
22 22 order Order Appointing Mediator Fri 07/31 8:59 AM
Order Referring case to Mediation and Appointing Mediator, BARBARA WEISMAN. Mediation shall commence no sooner than 8/3/2015 and be completed by 9/30/2015; and that the telephone conference scheduled with Judge Mannion for 9/23/2015 at 4:00 p.m. is adjourned to 10/8/2015 at 3:00 p.m.; etc Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/30/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
21 21 misc Letter Tue 07/28 12:59 PM
Letter from Resa T. Drasin, Esq.. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
20 20 adr Consent to Mediation Thu 07/23 5:04 PM
CONSENT to Mediation by RAMEE AYESH, CHRISTIAN GUZMAN(SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
19 19 order Order Thu 07/16 10:29 AM
TEXT ORDER -- Counsel shall inform the court within 10 days their choice for Mediator. A telephone conference is scheduled with Magistrate Judge Mannion on 9/23/2015 at 4:00 PM. Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call to 973-645-3827. Eight days before that date, counsel are to submit a joint agenda letter (no more than 3 pages) or joint dispute letter (up to 6 pages) itemizing the issues, if any, including settlement, to be discussed at the upcoming conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/14/2015. (spc, )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Tue 07/14 4:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: Counsel shall inform the Court of their choice of mediator within 10 days. A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 9/23/2015 at 4:00 p.m. Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. Eight days before that date, counsel are to submit a joint agenda letter (up to 3 pgs) or joint dispute letter (up to 6 pgs) itemizing the issues, if any, including settlement, to be discussed at the upcoming conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/14/15. (Mannion, Steven)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 07/16 10:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2015. Test order to be entered (spc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
17 17 misc Letter Wed 07/08 11:28 AM
Letter from Resa T. Drasin, Esq.. (DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2015
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/05 10:11 AM
ORDER, adjourning the Status Conference to 7/14/2015 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/3/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Fri 06/05 10:09 AM
ORDER adjourning the telephone conference to 7/14/15 at 5:00PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/3/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
14 14 misc Letter Mon 06/01 3:26 PM
Letter from Erica L. Shnayder. (SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
13 13 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Tue 03/03 1:20 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/27/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 25, 2015
12 12 misc Affidavit in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order Wed 02/25 1:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT/Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order of Erica L. Shnayder by RAMEE AYESH, CHRISTIAN GUZMAN.(SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 04, 2015
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/06 2:50 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: scheduling a Telephone Conference for 6/9/2015 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion, motions to amend, supplement or add new parties whether by amended or third-party complaint, must be filed by 6/12/2015, Fact Discovery due by 8/3/2015; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/4/15. (sr, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 02/06 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Scheduling Conference held on 2/4/2015. Initial scheduling order to be filed. (spc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 11, 2014
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 12/11 9:32 AM
ORDER Scheduling Initial Rule 16 Conference for 2/4/2015 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/4/2014. (spc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 21, 2014
9 9 Letter from Erica L. Shnayder, Esq.. (SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo no longer assigned to the case. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 05, 2014
8 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus.(DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
7 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by BOB CIASULLI AUTO GROUP, INC.,, RENE CRUZ.(DRASIN, RESA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 08, 2014
6 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *SHEREE RAIMO* (sr, )
Related: [-]
5 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by CHRISTIAN GUZMAN, RAMEE AYESH as to United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus. (SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 07, 2014
4 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOB CIASULLI AUTO GROUP, INC.,, RENE CRUZ, United Galaxy, Inc., individually and d/b/a Tri-County Lexus, filed by CHRISTIAN GUZMAN, RAMEE AYESH.(SHNAYDER, ERICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 24, 2014
3 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOB CIASULLI AUTO GROUP, INC.,, RENE CRUZ Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *RIPLEY SHIARELLA* (in-rs, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the SUMMONS attached to docket entry2 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/23/14 was not signed. Please disregard. (in-rs, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 23, 2014
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOB CIASULLI AUTO GROUP, INC.,, RENE CRUZ Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *RIPLEY SHIARELLA* (in-rs, ) Modified on 6/23/2014 (in-rs, ).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against BOB CIASULLI AUTO GROUP, INC.,, RENE CRUZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5768467) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHRISTIAN GUZMAN, RAMEE AYESH.(in-rs, ) Modified on 6/23/2014 (in-rs, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet