Texas Northern District Court
Judge:D Gordon Bryant, Jr
Case #: 5:21-cv-00053
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2021
Terminated:May 13, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 13, 2022
23 23 order Judgment Fri 05/13 2:16 PM
JUDGMENT: Of equal date herewith an Order of Dismissal having been entered, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Lonzo A. Caldwell's claims against the Littlefield Police Department are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Caldwell 's claims that unnamed detectives of the Littlefield Police Department deprived him of property or caused his home to be robbed are likewise DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. It is further ORDERED that Caldwell's request for injunctive relief in the form of immediate or accelerated release from prison is DISMISSED without prejudice to his ability to bring a separate habeas action. Finally, it is ORDERED that Caldwell's remaining claims are DISMISSED with prejudice until the conditions of Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994) are met. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 5/13/2022) (bdg)
Related: [-]
22 22 14 pgs order Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous Fri 05/13 2:12 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is ORDERED that Caldwell's claims against the Littlefield Police Department are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Caldwell's claims that unnamed detectives of the Littlefield Police Department deprived him of property or caused his home to be robbed are likewise DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Caldwell's request for injunctive relief in the form of immediate or accelerated release from prison is DISMISSED without prejudice to his ability to bring a separate habeas action. Caldwell's remaining claims are DISMISSED with prejudice until the conditions of Heck v. Humphrey are met. The undersigned therefore DENIES Caldwell's request for costs as a prevailing party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1). This dismissal shall count as a qualifying dismissal or "strike" under 28 U.S. C. § 1915 and Adepegba v. Hammons, 103 F.3d 383 (5th Cir. 1996). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 5/13/2022) (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/13 2:17 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22,23. Fri May 13 14:17:26 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/17 2:35 PM
NOTICE to Court regarding account history of payments filed by Lonzo A Caldwell. Clerk mailed a letter and a detailed payment history. (bdg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerks Letter
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 11/30 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Lonzo A Caldwell. New address: Powledge Unit 7-44, 1400 FM RD. 3452, Palestine, Texas 75803. (lkw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
19 19 respm Response/Objection Mon 06/28 11:19 AM
RESPONSE QUESTIONNAIRE AND DECLARATION filed by Lonzo A Caldwell re:18 Judge's Questionnaire (bmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
18 18 order Judge's Questionnaire Tue 06/15 4:01 PM
ORDER TO COMPLETE QUESTIONNAIRE: Judge's Questionnaire sent to Lonzo A. Caldwell. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 6/15/2021) (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 06/15 4:01 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18. Tue Jun 15 16:01:33 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
17 17 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 06/11 2:09 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge James Wesley Hendrix no longer assigned to case. This case shall hereinafter be numbered Civil Action No. 5:21-CV-0053-BQ. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/11/2021) (bmh)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/11 2:07 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to request appointment of counsel after the Court has completed screening of his case or should there be a material change of circumstances. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/11/2021) (bmh)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Directing Full Payment Fri 06/11 2:06 PM
PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 in monthly installments.(Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/11/2021) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 06/11 2:10 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15,16,17. Fri Jun 11 14:10:10 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/08 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Demands and Jury Demands re:12 Amended Complaint filed by Lonzo A Caldwell. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
13 13 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/24 9:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lonzo A. Caldwell. (bmh)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/24 9:26 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Littlefield Police Department filed by Lonzo A. Caldwell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Appoint Counsel Tue 05/18 1:35 PM
MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL AND MOTION TO GET ON A PAYMENT PLAN filed by Lonzo A. Caldwell. (bmh)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/18 11:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lonzo A. Caldwell. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Trust Account Tue 05/18 11:35 AM
Certificate of Trust Account by Lonzo A. Caldwell TDCJ # 02338220. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
8 8 misc Request for Copy Thu 05/06 1:44 PM
Request for Copy of Order7 , Amended Complaint Form and Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lonzo A. Caldwell. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk's Correspondence Letter
Friday, April 23, 2021
7 7 3 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Fri 04/23 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within 20 days from the date of this order, pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file with the Clerk the following: A signed application to proceed in forma pauperis; a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement; and Plaintiff must also submit a complete amended complaint on the court- approved form for civil-rights cases. Plaintiff may obtain the court-approved forms necessary for complying with this Order in the law library of his current prison unit. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/23/2021) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 04/23 10:59 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Apr 23 10:59:30 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 04/16 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Lonzo A. Caldwell. New address: Middleton Unit, 13055 FM 3522, Abilene, TX 79601. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
5 5 misc Prisoner/Social Security Consent Thu 03/11 1:31 PM
Prisoner Consent by Lonzo A. Caldwell to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
4 4 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 03/03 11:16 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Hendrix Wed 03/03 11:15 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Prisoner/Social Security Consent Wed 03/03 11:13 AM
Prisoner Consent by Lonzo A. Caldwell to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (bmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/03 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lonzo A. Caldwell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 03/03 11:18 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3,4. Wed Mar 3 11:18:20 CST 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]