New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:21-cv-04002
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 30, 2021 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC
Represented By
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC
Represented By
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
ANGELA GALES
Represented By
STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/17 1:38 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (mls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/21 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 22, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 05/22 10:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC (JAMES, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 05/22 8:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/04 9:14 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Thu 03/04 9:27 AM
Member Case Direct File on 3/3/2021, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/03 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12222069) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANGELA GALES.(RADOS, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet