Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Kim R Gibson
Case #: 3:21-cv-00031
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2021
Terminated:Jul 22, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 30, 2021 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
BLAIR COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By
Michael J. Wagner
Wagner & Finn
contact info
Mediator
SALLY CIMINI
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info
Mediator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC 525 William Penn Place 28th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD BISHOP
Represented By
Michael J. Bruzzese
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 22, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/22 4:24 PM
ORDER re16 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by DONALD BISHOP - The Plaintiff and the Defendant, by their respective attorneys, stipulate and agree that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the complaint and this action are dismissed with prejudice, without any award of fees and costs by the Court. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/22/2021. (dlg)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Thu 07/22 2:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by DONALD BISHOP. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
15 15 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 07/15 9:03 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION - Mediation. Sally G. Cimini is appointed as mediator. The ADR Conference shall be concluded on or before 9/7/2021, unless extended by Order of the Court. It is the responsibility of counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before 8/7/2021, and as more fully stated in said Order Referring Case to ADR. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/14/2021. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
14 14 order Case Management Order Tue 07/13 9:04 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 7/21/2021. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by 11/22/2021. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM, and as more fully stated in said Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/9/2021. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
13 13 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 07/07 3:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kim R. Gibson: An Initial Rule 16 Management Conference was held with counsel appearing telephonically. The Court discussed the Stipulation Selecting ADR, and stated it would order that ADR be completed by no later than 9/7/2021. The Court noted that the parties had not filed a Proposed Initial Scheduling Order. The Court stated that it would give the parties until 7/9/2021 to file the Proposed Initial Scheduling Order. The Court informed the parties that the proposed dated in the Rule 26(f) Report were acceptable, and the parties stated that they had no objection to those dates, and as more fully stated in said Conference Memo. (Court Reporter: None) (dlg)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Proposed Initial Scheduling Order Wed 07/07 3:24 PM
Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by BLAIR COMPANIES, INC.. (Wagner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
11 11 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 06/08 11:45 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DONALD BISHOP. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 06/07 1:47 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jjg)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Proposed Discovery Plan Mon 06/07 10:24 AM
***ERROR - SEE DOCUMENT10 *** PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by BLAIR COMPANIES, INC.. (Wagner, Michael) Modified on 6/7/2021 (jjg)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Wrong event selected Mon 06/07 1:47 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re9 Proposed Discovery Plan. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
8 8 adr Notice of Mediation Fri 06/04 4:09 PM
Notice of Mediation by SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI. Mediation Date 7/22/2021 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Mon 05/03 2:46 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLAIR COMPANIES, INC.. (Wagner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 30, 2021
6 6 order Case Management Order Fri 04/30 3:53 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held TELEPHONICALLY on July 7, 2021, at 1:00 p.m., and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/30/2021. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process,
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/30 10:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Jury Demand by BLAIR COMPANIES, INC.. (Wagner, Michael) Modified on 4/30/2021 (jjg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Fri 04/30 3:48 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re5 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/7/2021. (jjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/15 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wagner on behalf of BLAIR COMPANIES, INC.. (Wagner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/12 10:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONALD BISHOP. BLAIR COMPANIES, INC. waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
2 2 adr Notice of ADR Designation Wed 03/03 3:08 PM
NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 03/03 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against BLAIR COMPANIES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6387022), filed by DONALD BISHOP. (jjg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet