California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00087
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2021
Terminated:Mar 02, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Mar 04, 2021 11:28 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Laura Lloyd-Jenkins (1)
Terminated: 03/02/2021


Docket last updated: 03/05/2021 12:28 AM PST
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION as to Laura Lloyd-Jenkins. Received from the Northern District of Ohio as to Laura Lloyd-Jenkins (1). (jlmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]