Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. First Banker Mortgage Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01043 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 20, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
First Banker Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
70
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 07/16 11:44 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/12/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/20/2021. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/13/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2021. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 05/20 12:13 PM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 5/20/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/20 12:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1043 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/21 8:39 PM
Certificate of Service First Banker Mortgage Corporation filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 04/08 6:26 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing First Banker Mortgage Corporation filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 03/26 2:20 PM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/26/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 8:56 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/22 9:00 PM
Amended Complaint against First Banker Mortgage Corporation Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/16 5:03 PM
Certificate of Service and correct copies of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 03/05 5:07 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/5/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 03/04 9:02 PM
Adversary case 21-01043 Complaint against First Banker Mortgage Corporation (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |