Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. JD Financial Group Inc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01050 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JD Financial Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/07 2:15 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1050 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing JD Financial Group Inc filed by Joshua Slocum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Slocum, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service JD Financial Group Inc filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing JD Financial Group Inc filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/26/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 9:02 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Complaint against JD Financial Group Inc Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service and correct copies of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/5/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-01050 Complaint against JD Financial Group Inc (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |