Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Prime Time Mortgage Corp
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01062 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Prime Time Mortgage Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 06/03 1:39 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/03 3:26 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1062 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
ans
Statement
Fri 03/11 12:43 PM
Statement Notice of Cancellation of Hearing on Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.'s Application for Default Judgment on Liability filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, February 23, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/23 6:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Default Judgment Motion and Amended Notice of Hearing filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 02/17 4:45 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/31 11:06 AM
Certificate of Service of Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Thu 01/27 5:28 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment on Liability | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Christopher J. Lucht | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I | ||
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 01/21 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 01/20/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 01/18 11:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Prime Time Mortgage Corp. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 01/13 4:38 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Adversary Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - NJ Secretary of State Report | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Certification of Service | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Second summons | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Second Summons Certification of Service | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Email granting extension | ||
Wednesday, January 12, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
ans
Declaration
Wed 01/12 9:08 PM
Declaration of Christopher J. Lucht in Support of Request for Certificate of Default filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Adversary Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - New Jersey Secretary of State Report | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Certification of Service | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Second Summons | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Second Summons Certification of Service | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Email Granting Extension | ||
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 08/13 11:57 AM
Notice of Withdrawal (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
70
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 07/16 11:53 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/20/201 at 10:00 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/12/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/20/2021. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/13/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2021. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Agenda
Wed 05/19 7:38 PM
Notice of Agenda for Pre-Trial Conference filed by Joshua Slocum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Slocum, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/22 10:46 AM
Certificate of Service Prime Time Mortgage Corp filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 04/08 7:24 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Prime Time Mortgage Corp. filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 03/26 3:38 PM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/26/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 9:15 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/22 10:31 PM
Amended Complaint against Prime Time Mortgage Corp Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/16 5:51 PM
Certificate of Service and correct copies of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 03/05 5:14 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/5/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 03/04 11:54 PM
Adversary case 21-01062 Complaint against Prime Time Mortgage Corp (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |