Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Scott Edward Landeau
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01064 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Scott Edward Landeau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 06/03 1:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/03 3:28 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1064 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
70
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 07/16 11:53 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/20/201 at 10:00 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/12/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/20/2021. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/13/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2021. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Agenda
Wed 05/19 8:07 PM
Notice of Agenda for Pre-Trial Conference filed by Joshua Slocum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Slocum, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/22 11:26 AM
Affidavit of Service Scott Edward Landeau filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 04/08 7:34 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scott Edward Landeau filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Tue 04/06 11:46 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Scott Edward Landeau Answer Due: 5/6/2021. with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Mon 04/05 11:55 AM
Request for a Third Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 03/26 3:38 PM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/26/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 9:17 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/22 10:40 PM
Amended Complaint against Scott Edward Landeau Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Affidavit of Service
Thu 03/18 4:29 PM
Affidavit of Service re Scott Edward Landeau filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/16 5:54 PM
Certificate of Service and correct copies of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 03/05 5:14 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/5/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 03/05 12:11 AM
Adversary case 21-01064 Complaint against Scott Edward Landeau (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |