Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01066 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Order, Signed on 3/14/2024, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of LaToya M. Berry . (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by LaToya Berry on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Berry, LaToya) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Consent Order Granting Substitution of Counsel signed on 3/14/2024. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Proposed Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding by Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by LaToya Berry on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Berry, LaToya) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 03/14 1:56 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01066 mg] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16550438. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Person, Wilton) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Hearing Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/11/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Person, Wilton) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Smart Mortgage Centers, Inc. filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Person, Wilton) |
|
Sunday, October 02, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Shelley C. Chapman to Judge Martin Glenn. Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Letter Providing a Status Update Filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint signed on 9/12/2022 (White, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Letter to The Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, August 31, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Letter Request for Phone Conference Filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Person, Wilton) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Withdrawal (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/20/201 at 10:00 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/12/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/20/2021. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/13/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2021. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, July 07, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Pursuant to 12(B)(1) Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Standing filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Person, Wilton) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Agenda for Pre-Trial Conference filed by Joshua Slocum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Slocum, Joshua) |
|
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Person, Wilton) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc.. (Person, Wilton) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Smart Mortgage Centers Inc. filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service Smart Mortgage Centers Inc. filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/26/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 9:20 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Wilton A. Person signed on 3/24/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Complaint against Smart Mortgage Centers Inc. Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Wilton A Person on behalf of Smart Mortgage Centers Inc. with presentment to be held on 3/24/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC). (Person, Wilton) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 03/19 5:14 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01066 scc] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15210082. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service and correct copies of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/5/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-01066 Complaint against Smart Mortgage Centers Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |