Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:21-cv-00154
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 03, 2021 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Washington Systems, LLC
Represented By
Patricia Anderson Pryor
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Department of Labor
Represented By
Hema Steele
Dept Of Labor
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
71 71 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/21 5:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Washing Systems, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Patricia A. Pryor,
Att: 2 6 pgs Second Declaration of Cliff Dietrich
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 11/21 9:50 AM
NOTATION ORDER: GRANTING69 Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages. Defendant may file a reply of up to thirty (30) pages in support of its59 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/21/2024. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
69 69 motion File Excess Pages Wed 11/20 6:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Washing Systems, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 15, 2024
order Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 11/15 10:16 AM
NOTATION ORDER: GRANTING68 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply in support of its 58 motion for summary judgment under seal. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/15/2024. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
68 68 6 pgs motion File Document Under Seal Thu 11/14 12:53 PM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under Seal by Plaintiff Department of Labor. (Frey, Mary)
Related: [-]