South Carolina District Court
Case #: 6:21-cr-00079
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 06, 2021 2:56 AM EST
Defendant
Felipe Domingo-Lucas (1)
Represented By
Erica Marie Soderdahl
Federal Public Defender'S Office (gvle)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maxwell Barnes Cauthen, III
Us Attorneys Office (gville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/06/2021 3:24 AM EST
Monday, December 07, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas (1). (jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas: Initial Appearance set for 12/10/2020 11:00 AM in Greenville #1, Clement F Haynsworth Fed Bldg, 300 E Washington St, Greenville before Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin. **The defendant will be transported by ICE and should be in the courtroom not later than 10:50 a.m. to allow defense counsel the opportunity to speak with the defendant using the interpreter.(jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
7 7 Arrest of Felipe Domingo-Lucas. Clerk notified by: DHS. (awil, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
6 6 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/8/20 in case as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas. (awil, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin: Initial Appearance as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas held on 12/10/2020. The defendant is present in custody with AFPD Erica Soderdahl. The defendant waives reading of charges/penalties and waive preliminary hearing. Bond not set due to immigration detainer. Oral Rule 5(f) Order. FPD appointed. Court Reporter Court Smart 1 Ashley Buckingham. Court Interpreter:Martin Pollock. Language: Spanish. (jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
9 9 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Erica Marie Soderdahl for Felipe Domingo-Lucas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/10/20.(jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORAL WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Felipe Domingo-Lucas. (jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
11 11 FRCrP 5(f) DISCLOSURE ORDER as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/10/20.(jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
12 12 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit Related [+] by Felipe Domingo-Lucas (dpagan-USPO, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-] stricted Access
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
14 14 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/08/2020 in case as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas. (bwalters-USMS, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
15 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Cauthen, Maxwell) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
16 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 01/22/2021.(ncha, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
17 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Cauthen, Maxwell) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas (1). Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 1/28/21.(jtho, ) [6:20-mj-00117-CRI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
19 19 INFORMATION as to Felipe Domingo-Lucas (1) count 1. (jtho, )
Related: [-]