Aaron Olson v. Christopher Kopel, et al
Original Case: 0:14-cv-00306
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-02515 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 9:21 PM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Christopher Kopel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Austin Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Siv Yurichuk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Karl Schreck
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Todd McMurray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ron Rollins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Steven Pavoni
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chisago County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Washington County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of Fridley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Aaron Olson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 9:21 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 25, 2014 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4168781] 14-2515 (CYZ) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, R&R dated 3/11/14, order adopting R&R dated 6/5/14, judgment of 6/6/14 [4168808] 14-2515 (CYZ) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Kindly submit these documents within 10 days. [4168812] 14-2515 (CYZ) | ||
APPEARANCE filed by Ryan M. Zipf for Appellee City of Fridley w/service 06/25/2014 [4168896] 14-2515 (RMZ) | ||
APPEARANCE filed by JOSEPH E. FLYNN for Appellees Mr. Christopher Kopel, Mr. Austin Peterson and Mr. Ron Rollins w/service 06/25/2014 [4169110] 14-2515 (JEF) |