|
GPO
Mar 05 2021
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.. Signed by MDL Panel Clerk on 3/5/2021. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
|
|
GPO
Oct 08 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 1821 and 1829 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 1821 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Andres V. Lerner and 1829 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Kevin M. Murphy.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (BBM)
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8716) re 8084 and 8070 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8084 Motion to Exclude in Part Section 2 and Debit Opinions of Professor Jerry Hausman and 8070 Motion to Exclude Testimony Concerning Visa's Fixed Acquirer Network Fee.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION (Redaction of Document 8717) re 8181 and 8200 Motions to Exclude and 8179 Motion for Joinder. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8181 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report & Opinions of Defense Expert Kevin M. Murphy, grants in part and denies in part 8200 Motion to Exclude Portions of Reports & Opinions of Defense Experts Marc Cleven & Stuart J. Fiske, and grants 8179 Motion for Joinder.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8718) re 8077, 8086, 8080, and 8075 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants in part and denies in part 8077 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mansour Karimzadeh, 8086 Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dennis W. Carlton, 8080 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Stephen C. Mott, and 8075 Motion to Exclude Opinions of David P. Stowell.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
es: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8719) re 8090, 8108, 8114, 8135, and 8207 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8090 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report and Opinions of Defense Expert R. Garrison Harvey, grants in part and denies in part 8108 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Glenn Hubbard, denies 8114 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Barbara E. Kahn, denies 8135 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert David J. Teece, and grants in part and denies in part 8207 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report and Opinions of Defense Expert David P. Kaplan.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/9/2022. Associated Cas
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8720) re 8138. Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8138 Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Opinions on EMV Chargebacks and for Partial Summary Judgment.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
|
|
GPO
Jun 03 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (previously filed under seal as 9308) re 9056 Defendants' Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement, 9060 Intuit's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 9070 Lanning and Camp Grounds Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants Defendants' motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement and finds that Square's merchant-customers and Intuit's merchant-customers "accepted" payment cards and are therefore members of the Rule 23(b)(3) Class, denies the Lanning and Camp Grounds Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment, and denies Intuit's cross-motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/28/2024. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JAM, 1:21-cv-01175-MKB-JAM, 1:21-cv-02360-MKB-JAM, 1:21-cv-03401-MKB-JAM, 1:23-cv-05377-MKB-JAM (TSR, STS) (Entered: 05/28/2024)
|
|
GPO
Aug 08 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 9358 Motion to Stay in case 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JAM. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court finds that a stay is unwarranted and denies Lanning Plaintiffs' motion. Class Counsel is directed to establish and fund a trust account with settlement funds owed to merchants who used the services of payment facilitators such as Square and Intuit, pending the Second Circuit's resolution of the appeal. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/8/2024. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JAM, 1:21-cv-01175-MKB-JAM, 1:21-cv-02360-MKB-JAM, 1:21-cv-03401-MKB-JAM, 1:23-cv-05377-MKB-JAM (STS, TSR)
|