Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20257

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 2:21-ap-02003
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2021
Terminated:Aug 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Berry Huff McDonald Milligan, Inc.
10 Moulton Street
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Berry Huff McDonald Milligan, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Hill Street Apartments, LLC
188 Dartmouth Street
Portland, ME 04103
Represented By
Hill Street Apartments, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Paul J. and Mary P. DiMascio
P.O. Box 708
Saco, ME 04072
Represented By
Paul J. and Mary P. DiMascio
contact info
Defendant
Daniel and Ingrid Joyce
319 Littleton Road Suite 304
Westford, MA 01886
Represented By
Daniel and Ingrid Joyce
contact info
Defendant
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pacios, Chartered, LLP
P.O. Box 9546
Portland, ME 04112
Represented By
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pacios, Chartered, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cynthia Peterson
39 Kingman Street #2
Lunenburg, MA 01462
Represented By
Cynthia Peterson
contact info
Defendant
Turner Acquisitions, LLC
5 Turner Street
Waltham, MA 02454
Represented By
Turner Acquisitions, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Renco Management, Inc
100 Summer Street
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Renco Management, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Edmond J. Ford
Ford McDonald McPartlin & Borden P.A. 10 Pleasant Street Suite 400
Portsmouth, NH 03801
Represented By
Ryan M. Borden, Esq.
Ford, Mcdonald, Mcpartlin & Borden, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, August 12, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 08/12 10:55 AM
Disposition of Adversary Judgment For Plaintiff. (rmp)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/12 11:03 AM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2003 has been closed administratively, but not pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a). Additional pleadings, motions and other papers may be filed in this adversary proceeding without filing a motion to re-open. (rmp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Sat 07/31 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 07/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Judgment
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Thu 07/29 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 07/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
36 36 order Judgment Wed 07/28 3:51 PM
Final Judgment. (rmp)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Proposed Order Wed 07/28 1:50 PM
Proposed Order Filed by Edmond J. Ford Related [+]. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
court Entry Wed 07/28 3:25 PM
Entr Related [+]. Pursuant to Local Rule, Counsel is requested to file an appropriate application to compromise in the main case, 20-20257 No action will be taken on the proposed order until after disposition of an application to compromise controversy. (rmp)
Related: [-] 35 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
Monday, July 26, 2021
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 07/26 9:34 AM
Default Judgment Related [+] (rmp)
Related: [-] 26
Sunday, July 18, 2021
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Mon 07/19 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 07/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, July 16, 2021
32 32 order Extend Time Fri 07/16 4:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Renco Management, Inc of c/o Deborah L. Anderson, R.A. Answer Deadline Reset for 8/16/2021; Turner Acquisitions, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 8/16/2021. This Order shall become final in fourteen (14) days unless a party in interest sooner objects, in which case the matter shall be set for hearing and considered by the Court as if this Order had not been entered. (mep)
Related: [-] 31
Thursday, July 15, 2021
31 31 motion Extend Time - Adversary Case Thu 07/15 11:48 AM
Fourth Motion to Extend Time To Enlarge Answer Deadline Filed by Renco Management, Inc, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 18, 2021
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/19 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
29 29 2 pgs order Extend Time Wed 06/16 2:29 PM
Order Granting Third Consented-to Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Renco Management, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/15/2021; Turner Acquisitions, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 7/15/2021. This Order shall become final in fourteen (14) days unless a party in interest sooner objects, in which case the matter shall be set for hearing and considered by the Court as if this Order had not been entered.(amk)
Related: [-] 28
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 06/16 2:31 PM
Answer Deadline Amended for Defendant, Renco Management, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/15/202 Related [+]. (srd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 06/16 2:33 PM
Answer Deadline Amended for Defendant, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/15/202 Related [+]. (srd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
28 28 motion Extend Time - Adversary Case Tue 06/15 2:23 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Answer Deadline Filed by Renco Management, Inc, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 misc Amended Notice of Hearing Tue 06/15 1:49 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Filed by Edmond J. Ford Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Objections due by 7/20/2021. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-] 26 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
26 26 motion Default Judgment Tue 06/15 1:28 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Edmond J. Ford. Hearing scheduled for 7/28/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Objections due by 7/21/2021. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Statement in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment
Att: 2 Hearing Notice
Att: 3 Proposed Order
court Entry Tue 06/15 1:33 PM
Entr Related [+]. The Motion for Default Judgment(the Motion) has been noticed for an incorrect hearing date. The hearing has been stricken from the Courts calendar. Although the Motion remains on the docket, the Movant must immediately re-notice the Motion for an appropriate hearing. Failure to do so may result in denial of the Motion. (rmp)
Related: [-] 26 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
Thursday, June 03, 2021
25 25 1 pgs court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 06/03 9:56 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Berry Huff McDonald Milligan, Inc.; Hill Street Apartments, LLC; Paul J. and Mary P. DiMascio; Daniel and Ingrid Joyce; Preti, Flaherty, Beliveau & Pacios, Chartered, LLP and Cynthia Peterso Related [+]. (rmp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
24 24 misc Amended Document Wed 06/02 3:46 PM
Amended Signed Statement of Ryan M. Borden in Support of Request for Entry of Default Filed by Edmond J. Ford Related [+]. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-] 19 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
Friday, May 28, 2021
23 23 answer Response Fri 05/28 2:58 PM
Plaintiff's Response Filed by Edmond J. Ford Related [+]. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Show Cause
22 22 misc Supplemental Document Fri 05/28 11:04 AM
Supplemental Document Filed by Edmond J. Ford Related [+]. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-] 19 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
Friday, May 21, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/22 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 05/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Extend Time
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/22 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 05/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Show Cause
19 19 misc Request for Entry of Default Fri 05/21 4:39 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Edmond J. Ford. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Sworn Statement of Ryan M. Borden
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 misc Withdraw Document Fri 05/21 4:33 PM
Withdrawal of Document. Reason for Withdrawal: Referenced incorrect lead case Filed by Edmond J. Ford Related [+]. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-] 17 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
17 17 misc Request for Entry of Default Fri 05/21 3:52 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Edmond J. Ford. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Sworn Statement of Ryan M. Borden
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
16 16 order Extend Time Wed 05/19 3:29 PM
Order Granting Second Consented to Motion to Enlarge Answer Deadline. Related [+] The deadline for Renco Management Inc., and Turner Acquisitions, LLC to file an Answer to the Complaint is extended to 6/15/2021. This Order shall become final in fourteen (14) days unless a party in interest sooner objects, in which case the matter shall be set for hearing and considered by the Court as if this Order had not been entered.(rmp)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 order Show Cause Wed 05/19 3:21 PM
Order to Appear and Show Cause against Plaintiff for Failure to Prosecute Against Non-Answering Defendants. (rmp)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extend Time Wed 05/19 9:31 AM
Consent Motion to Extend Time Second Consented-To Motion to Enlarge Answer Deadline Filed by Renco Management, Inc, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 09, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/10 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, April 08, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/09 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/08/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 9013-1(d) Deficiency Order
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
11 11 order Extend Time Wed 04/07 2:46 PM
Order Granting Consented to Motion to Enlarge Answer Deadline. Related [+] Renco Management, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 5/19/2021; Turner Acquisitions, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 5/19/2021. Pre-Trial Conference reschedule d for 6/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. This Order shall become final in fourteen (14) days unless a party in interest sooner objects, in which case the matter shall be set for hearing and considered by the Court as if this Order had not been entered.(rmp) Modified on 4/7/2021 (rmp)
Related: [-] 10
utility Update Other Deadlines Wed 04/07 2:48 PM
Other Deadlines Update Related [+]. Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021. (rmp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
10 10 motion Extend Time - Adversary Case Tue 04/06 2:35 PM
Consent Motion to Extend Time Filed by Renco Management, Inc, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 1 pgs order 9013-1(d) Deficiency Order Tue 04/06 2:11 PM
Rule 9013-1(d) Deficiency Order Related [+] (rmp)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Turner Acquisitions, LLC, Defendant Renco Management, Inc
8 8 motion Extend Time - Adversary Case Tue 04/06 11:50 AM
Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Filed by Renco Management, Inc, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 04/06 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney by Kellie W. Fisher Esq. Filed by on behalf of Renco Management, Inc, Turner Acquisitions, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
6 6 misc Hearing Set Mon 04/05 11:51 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Edmond J. Ford. Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Objections due by 5/4/2021. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 03/23 3:07 PM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney by Tyler J. Smith Esq. Filed by on behalf of Daniel and Ingrid Joyce. (Smith, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 03/19 5:08 PM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney by Eleanor L. Dominguez Esq. Filed by on behalf of Cynthia Peterson. (Dominguez, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/10 11:02 AM
Summons Service Executed on Berry Huff McDonald Milligan, Inc. 3/10/2021; Paul J. and Mary P. DiMascio 3/10/2021; Hill Street Apartments, LLC 3/10/2021; Daniel and Ingrid Joyce 3/10/2021; Cynthia Peterson 3/10/2021; Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pacios, Chartered, LLP 3/10/2021; Renco Management, Inc 3/10/2021; Turner Acquisitions, LLC 3/10/2021 .. (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 03/08 3:07 PM
Summons Issued on Berry Huff McDonald Milligan, Inc. Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Paul J. and Mary P. DiMascio Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Hill Street Apartments, LLC Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Daniel and Ingrid Joyce Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Cynthia Peterson Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pacios, Chartered, LLP Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Renco Management, Inc Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021; Turner Acquisitions, LLC Date Issued 3/8/2021, Answer Due 4/7/2021 Related [+]. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 09:00 AM at Portland. Pre-Trial Order due by 5/4/2021. Modified on 3/8/2021 (tll)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Edmond J. Ford
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint ** Use Open an AP Case to Open Adversary ** Mon 03/08 11:57 AM
Adversary case 21-02003 Complaint by Edmond J. Ford against Berry Huff McDonald Milligan, Inc., Hill Street Apartments, LLC, Paul J. and Mary P. DiMascio, Daniel and Ingrid Joyce, Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pacios, Chartered, LLP, Cynthia Peterson, Turner Acquisitions, LLC, Renco Management, Inc. Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Borden, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Adversary cover sheet