Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Alderus Funding & Investments LLC and Hamilton Hom
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01075 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Alderus Funding & Investments LLC and Hamilton Home Loans, Inc., as successor to Alderus Funding & Investments LLC
|
Represented By
Alderus Funding & Investments LLC and Hamilton Home Loans, Inc., as successor to Alderus Funding & Investments LLC
contact info |
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 08, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 03/08 10:57 AM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 3/8/2022 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/08 10:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1075 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 01/19 8:55 AM
So Ordered Joint Rule 26(F) Report and Proposed Discovery Plan signed on 1/18/2022 (White, Greg) |
|
18 | 18
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 01/19 8:53 AM
Order Governing the Production of Confidential Materials in Discovery signed on 1/18/2022 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer, Amended Complaint
Fri 10/01 11:56 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Paul Rubin on behalf of Hamilton Home Loans, Inc.. (Rubin, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/25 4:36 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by William Gagas on behalf of Alderus Funding & Investments LLC. (Gagas, William) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/25 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Christopher Marks on behalf of Alderus Funding & Investments LLC. (Marks, Christopher) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/25 4:29 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Daniel H. Oliner on behalf of Alderus Funding & Investments LLC. (Oliner, Daniel) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 08/13 11:35 AM
Notice of Withdrawal (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
70
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 07/16 11:53 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 5/20/201 at 10:00 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/12/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/20/2021. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/13/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2021. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Agenda
Wed 05/19 6:42 PM
Notice of Agenda for Pre-Trial Conference filed by Joshua Slocum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) (Slocum, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/04 9:52 AM
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas Curran signed on 5/4/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Mon 05/03 12:57 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas H. curran filed by Thomas H Curran on behalf of Alderus Funding & Investments LLC. (Curran, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Order on Thomas H. Curran's Motion for Admission to Practice, Pro Hac Vice | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 05/03 6:51 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01075 scc] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15326483. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer, Amended Complaint
Thu 04/29 9:44 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Sophia Hepheastou on behalf of Alderus Funding & Investments LLC. (Hepheastou, Sophia) |
|
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/21 7:55 PM
Certificate of Service Alderus Funding & Investments LLC et al filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 04/08 5:02 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Alderus Funding & Investments LLC et al filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 03/30 11:45 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/29/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 8:38 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/22 8:10 PM
Amended Complaint against Alderus Funding & Investments LLC and Hamilton Home Loans, Inc., as successor to Alderus Funding & Investments LLC Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/17 5:30 PM
Certificate of Service and correct copies of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 03/09 11:50 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/8/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 03/05 6:06 PM
Adversary case 21-01075 Complaint against Alderus Funding & Investments LLC and Hamilton Home Loans, Inc., as successor to Alderus Funding & Investments LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |